Murphy v. Torres et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | R Bryan Harwell |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00999 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2017 5:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
Ryan W Burlingham
|
|
Defendant
Ricardo A Francis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Veronica Sumpter Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alexander Torres
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lauren Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Document E-Mailed
Wed 06/07 9:33 AM
***DOCUMENT E-MAILED:6 Order on Motion to Remand e-mailed to Dillon County Clerk of Court. True certified copy also placed in US Mail to the same at Gwen T. Hyatt, 301 W Main St, PO Drawer 1220, Dillon, SC 29536. (hcic, ) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Wed 06/07 9:25 AM
ORDER granting 5 Motion to Remand. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 6/7/2017. (hcic, ) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Remand
Fri 06/02 3:00 PM
Joint MOTION to Remand by Ryan W Burlingham, Ricardo A Francis, Veronica Sumpter Richardson, Alexander Torres. Response to Motion due by 6/16/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Grantland, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant Francis' Second Set of Requests to Admit | ||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/24 1:32 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/15/2017, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/30/2017, Rule 26 Report due by 5/30/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/24/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/22/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/21/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/21/2017, Discovery due by 11/20/2017, Motions due by 12/5/2017, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/20/2018, ADR Statement due by 1/6/2018, Mediation Due by 2/5/2018. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to 4/2/2018. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 4/2/2018. Signed by the Honorable R. Bryan Harwell on 4/24/2017. (hcic, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Wed 04/19 1:27 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ricardo A Francis. (hcic, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/19 1:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dillon County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2016-CP 17-00620 (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7108504), filed by Ricardo A Francis. (hcic, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exh A-State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Exh B-Plaintiffs Responses to Requests to Admit, | ||
Att: 3 Exh C-Defendants Torres, Francis, and Richardson's Answers in State Court, | ||
Att: 4 Exh D-Defendants Torres and Richardson's Consents to Removal, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service |