Bladzik et al v. Great West Casualty Company et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela Pepper |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00559 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 16, 2017 4:37 AM CDT |
Defendant
ABC Company
|
|
Defendant
Michael R Conn
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Great West Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Koleaseco Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Koleaseco Leasing LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Koleaseco Logistics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Involuntary Plaintiff
Blue Cross & Blue Shield of North Carolina
|
|
Involuntary Plaintiff
Commerce and Industry Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosalie K Bladzik
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Involuntary Plaintiff
Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois
Terminated: 05/23/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 03/01 10:16 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/1/2018.29 Stipulation for Distribution of Settlement Proceeds APPROVED. All claims and causes of action by plaintiff and involuntary plaintiff against defendants DISMISSED with prejudice and without further costs to any party. (cc: all counsel)(cb) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation
Mon 02/12 3:44 PM
STIPULATION by Rosalie K Bladzik.(Crivello, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Distribution of Settlement Proceeds Pursuant to Wis. Stats. 102.29 and for Dismissal of the Case | ||
order
Text Only Order
Mon 02/12 2:26 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/12/2018 re28 Notice of Settlement filed by Rosalie K. Bladzik. On February 9, 2018, the plaintiff filed a notice of settlement and indicated that a "Stipulation and Order for Distribution of Settlement Proceeds Pursuant to Wis. Stat §102.29 and for Dismissal of the Case" is forthcoming. Dkt. No. 28. The court ORDERS that the clerk's office shall close this case administratively. The court further ORDERS that if and when the parties file the above-mentioned stipulation or unopposed motion of voluntary dismissal, the court will convert the closure to the resolution required by the pleading. ( Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. ) (cc: all counsel)(cb) |
||
utility
Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys
Tue 02/13 8:16 AM
Case administratively closed pursuant to 02/12/2018 Text Only Order. (amb) |
||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 02/09 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Rosalie K Bladzik. (Crivello, Robert) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
trial
Witness List
Fri 09/01 9:26 AM
Witness List by Rosalie K Bladzik.(Crivello, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Report of Dr. Mark Rusch, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Report of Dr. Barbara Hummel | ||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
service
Admission of Service
Fri 08/11 10:50 AM
ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, First Set of Interrogatories, First RPDs, First Req for Admissions on 05/01/2017 by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of North Carolina (Crivello, Robert) |
|
25 | 25
service
Admission of Service
Fri 08/11 10:48 AM
ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, First Set of Interrogatories, First Req for RPDs, First Req for Admissions, Amended Summons and Complaint on 06/05/2017 by Koleaseco, Inc. (Crivello, Robert) |
|
24 | 24
service
Admission of Service
Fri 08/11 10:45 AM
ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, First Set of Interrogatories, First Req for RPDs, First Req for Admissions on 06/05/2017 by Coleaseco, Inc. (Crivello, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/19 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D Crivello on behalf of Rosalie K Bladzik. Attorney(s) appearing: Robert R. Crivello appearing in place of Mark L. Thomsen (Crivello, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 07/13 6:15 PM
Minute and Order Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pamela Pepper: Scheduling Conference held on 7/5/2017. Initial discovery disclosures due 7/31/2017; Amended Pleadings due 8/31/2017, Plaintiff's Treating Providers/Expert Witness List due 9/8/2017; Defendants' Expert Witness List due 11/30/2017; Discovery due 2/9/2018. See order regarding documents containing privileged information. (cb) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/30 10:35 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Commerce and Industry Insurance Company. (Nemo, Michael) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/30 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Nemo on behalf of Commerce and Industry Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael J. Nemo (Nemo, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
service
Admission of Service
Wed 06/28 3:52 PM
ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, First Set of Interrogatories, First Request for Production Documents, First Request for Admissions on June 5, 2017 by Koleaseco Leasing, LLC by RA J.P. Koop (Thomsen, Mark) |
|
18 | 18
service
Admission of Service
Wed 06/28 3:51 PM
ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, First Set of Interrogatories, First Request for Production Documents, First Request for Admissions on June 5, 2017 by Koleaseco Logistics Inc. by RA J.P. Kook (Thomsen, Mark) |
|
17 | 17
service
Admission of Service
Wed 06/28 3:48 PM
ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, First Set of Interrogatories, First Request for Production Documents, First Request for Admissions on April 26, 2017 by Great West Casualty Company c/o Gass Weber Mullins, LLC, RA (Thomsen, Mark) |
|
16 | 16
service
Admission of Service
Wed 06/28 3:44 PM
ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, First Set of Interrogatories, First Request for Production Documents, First Request for Admissions on May 23, 2017 by Koleaseco, Inc. (Thomsen, Mark) |
|
15 | 15
service
Admission of Service
Wed 06/28 3:41 PM
ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, First Set of Interrogatories, First Request for Production Documents, First Request for Admissions on May 1, 2017 by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of North Carolina (Thomsen, Mark) |
|
14 | 14
service
Admission of Service
Wed 06/28 3:37 PM
ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, First Set of Interrogatories, First Request for Production Documents, First Request for Admissions on April 24, 2017 by Commerce and Industry Insurance Company c/o Corporation Service Company, RA (Thomsen, Mark) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Plan
Wed 06/28 3:28 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Rosalie K Bladzik. (Thomsen, Mark) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Approving Stipulation
Thu 05/25 1:16 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/25/2017 APPROVING11 Stipulation to dismiss Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois as an Involuntary Plaintiff. The court ORDERS that Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois is DISMISSED as a party to this lawsuit. (cc: all counsel)(pwm) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 05/19 3:24 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Illinois. (Levenhagen, Mary) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Disclosure Statement
Fri 05/19 3:07 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Rosalie K Bladzik. (Thomsen, Mark) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 05/19 3:04 PM
Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Rosalie K Bladzik. (Thomsen, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 05/09 2:08 PM
Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Michael R Conn, Great West Casualty Company, Koleaseco Inc, Koleaseco Leasing LLC, Koleaseco Logistics Inc. (Starrett, Jay) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 04/28 9:15 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/28/2017 (amb) |
||
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 04/27 8:31 AM
NOTICE of hearing: A Rule 16 scheduling conference is scheduled for July 5, 2017 at 2:30 PM by telephone before Judge Pamela Pepper. The parties may appear by calling the court's conference line at 888-557-8511 and using the access code 4893665#. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(1) and Civ. L. R. 26(a), the parties must file a Rule 26(f) discovery plan no later than seven (7) days before the date of the Rule 16 conference. The court expects the parties to comply with the rules. The court may decline to discuss scheduling or issue a scheduling order until the parties have filed the Rule 26(f) plan. For additional information, please refer to Judge Pepper's procedures on the court's website at www.wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(pwm) |
||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/26 9:02 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael R Conn, Great West Casualty Company, Koleaseco Inc, Koleaseco Leasing LLC, Koleaseco Logistics Inc.(Starrett, Jay) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 04/21 12:38 PM
The court advises the plaintiff that if, within forty-five (45) days of the filing of the complaint, either no answer has been filed or the plaintiff has not filed a certificate of service demonstrating that the plaintiff has properly executed the summons and served the complaint, the court will require the plaintiff to appear at a status conference regarding the delay. (kgw) |
||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/19 2:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael R Conn, Great West Casualty Company, Koleaseco Inc, Koleaseco Leasing LLC, Koleaseco Logistics Inc (Starrett, Jay) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/19 2:44 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Koleaseco Leasing LLC. (Starrett, Jay) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/19 2:43 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Koleaseco Logistics Inc. (Starrett, Jay) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/19 2:42 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Koleaseco Inc. (Starrett, Jay) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/19 2:41 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Great West Casualty Company. (Starrett, Jay) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/19 2:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Koleaseco Inc, Koleaseco Logistics Inc, Koleaseco Leasing LLC, Michael R Conn, Great West Casualty Company from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 17-CV-002328 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2562178)(Starrett, Jay) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 04/19 2:45 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl) |