Davis et al v. Dwyer et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lynn Adelman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00561 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 16, 2017 4:42 AM CDT |
Defendant
Meghan A Dwyer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WITI Television LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmy D Davis , Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JD Davis Funeral Home LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Tribune Media Company
Terminated: 05/11/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)
Thu 05/10 8:56 AM
NOTICE: The parties filed a stipulation of dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). They also submitted a proposed order purporting to dismiss the case. However, a stipulation of dismissal is self-executing, and no separate order is necessary. Therefore, I will not sign the proposed order. See Scott v. Delbert Servs. Corp., 973 F. Supp. 2d 949 (E.D. Wis. 2013). (jad) |
||
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 05/09 1:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jimmy D Davis, Jr.(Plichta, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
order
Text Only Order
Wed 03/28 11:38 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 03/28/2018. In light of the parties' successful mediation, this case will be closed for administrative purposes pending receipt of a stipulation of dismissal. (cc: all counsel)(lls) |
||
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 03/22 2:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David E Jones: Mediation held on 3/21/2018. The mediation/settlement conference resulted in final resolution of the plaintiff's claims. Accordingly, the matter is returned to the assigned judge for further proceedings. (Tape #10:04:30 - 4:56:01) (amb) |
|
utility
Case No Longer Referred
Thu 05/10 8:10 AM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge David E Jones. (amb) |
||
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
4
pgs
order
Order
Tue 02/06 2:33 PM
ORDER Regarding Mediation Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 2/6/2018. (cc: all counsel)(amb) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
minutes
Mediation Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 02/06 10:07 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David E Jones: Telephonic Status Conference re: Mediation held on 2/5/2018. Plaintiffs to provide defendants written offer and defendants to provide plaintiffs written counter offer. Plaintiff to provide all written submissions to court by 03/16/2018 by 12:00 PM. Plaintiffs' and defendants' ex parte statements to the court by 03/16/2018 by 12:00 PM. Mediation set for 3/21/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 254, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. (Tape #9:59:09 - 10:18:21) (amb) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 01/18 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference re: Mediation set for 2/5/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge David E Jones. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 877-848-7030 and use access code 3866147# to join the call.(cc: all counsel)(amb) |
||
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (for mediation)
Wed 01/17 4:28 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David E Jones for mediation. Signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/17/2018. (cc: all counsel)(gc) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Letter
Fri 01/12 3:06 PM
LETTER from Dustin Brown regarding joint request that the Court appoint a magistrate to conduct mediation . (Brown, Dustin) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/11 1:30 PM
ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY. Signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/11/2018. (cc: all counsel)(gc) |
|
27 | 27
order
Protective Order
Thu 01/11 1:29 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/11/2018. (cc: all counsel)(gc) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation
Mon 01/08 4:51 PM
STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by Meghan A Dwyer, WITI Television LLC.(Brown, Dustin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, November 18, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 11/20 9:52 AM
ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/18/2017. Amended pleadings due by 12/15/2017; pre-mediation discovery due by 1/14/2018; parties to advise court by 1/14/2018 as to how they wish to proceed with mediation. (cc: all counsel)(gc) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 11/16 4:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/15/2017. Parties discussed possibility of mediation. Court advised parties that magistrate judges are available to assist with mediation. The Court will adopt the parties agreed-upon deadlines for amending pleadings and pre-mediation discovery in a separate order. (gc) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 11/06 4:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/6/2017. Status Conference to schedule further proceedings set for 11/15/2017 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Judge Lynn Adelman. The court will initiate the call. Counsel must call the court prior to the call at 414-297-1285 to provide contact information. (cc: all counsel)(gc) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
15
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 10/18 9:45 AM
IT IS ORDERED that defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings15 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants motion to stay discovery pending resolution of their motion for judgment on the pleadings19 is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/17/2017. (cc: all counsel) (lls) |
|
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 10/09 7:06 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re19 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay Discovery .(Plichta, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Anne M. Plichta, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Declaration
Mon 10/02 3:49 PM
DECLARATION of Dustin B. Brown in Support of Defendants' Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion to Stay Discovery(Brown, Dustin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Discovery Requests, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence | ||
19 | 19
motion
Stay
Mon 10/02 3:45 PM
Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay Discovery by Meghan A Dwyer, WITI Television LLC. (Brown, Dustin) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply Brief in Support of Motion
Fri 08/25 6:17 PM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Meghan A Dwyer, WITI Television LLC re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Brown, Dustin) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Fri 08/11 11:03 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Plichta, Anne) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Fri 07/21 2:27 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Meghan A Dwyer, WITI Television LLC re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings .(Brown, Dustin) |
|
Att: 1 Latino Food Marketers, LLC v. Ole Mexican Foods, Inc., No. 03-C-0190-C, 2004 WL 632869 (W.D. Wis. Mar. 29, 2004) | ||
15 | 15
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Fri 07/21 2:22 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Meghan A Dwyer, WITI Television LLC. (Brown, Dustin) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 07/11 3:42 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman:Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/11/2017; Defendant's motion for judgment on pleadings due 07/21/2017. Parties will brief motion in accordance to local rules. After court decides motion, it will schedule further proceedings, if necessary (jcl) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Plan
Mon 07/03 2:02 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by all Plaintiffs and by All Defendants. (Brown, Dustin) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 05/26 1:42 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/26/17. Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2017 11:30 AM by Telephone before Judge Lynn Adelman. (cc: all counsel)(gc) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Exhibits Received
Fri 05/26 12:27 PM
EXHIBIT received- Exhibit D to10 available in Judge's folder only for All Defendants (jcl) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 05/25 3:51 PM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Meghan A Dwyer, WITI Television LLC.(Brown, Dustin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit D - Filed Conventionally, see Dkt. 9, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit E - Article | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)
Wed 05/24 5:10 PM
NOTICE by Meghan A Dwyer, WITI Television LLC of Conventional Filing of Exhibit D to Answer to Amended Complaint (Brown, Dustin) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 05/11 10:45 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Meghan A Dwyer, WITI Television LLC filed by Jimmy D Davis, Jr, JD Davis Funeral Home LLC.(jcl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 05/11 9:53 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/11/17 GRANTING7 Motion for Leave to File Unopposed Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion to Amend Complaint. Defendant's must respond to the Amended Complaint within 14 days after the motion is granted. (cc: all counsel) (gc) |
||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Leave to File Document
Tue 05/09 3:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion to Amend Complaint by All Plaintiffs.(Plichta, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Mon 04/24 3:15 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, until May 10, 2017 by All Defendants. (Brown, Dustin) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/24 12:44 PM
Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Jimmy D Davis, Jr, JD Davis Funeral Home LLC. (Plichta, Anne) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/20 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James A Friedman on behalf of Meghan A Dwyer, Tribune Media Company. Attorney(s) appearing: James A. Friedman (Friedman, James) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/20 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T Flaherty on behalf of Meghan A Dwyer, Tribune Media Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel T. Flaherty (Flaherty, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/20 10:11 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Meghan A Dwyer, Tribune Media Company. (Brown, Dustin) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/19 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tribune Media Company, Meghan A Dwyer from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2017cv1662 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2562298)(Brown, Dustin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Action Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Action Other Pleadings, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 04/19 3:33 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl) |