McKenney v. Mangino
Original Case: 2:15-cv-00073
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-civil-01378 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 09, 2017 4:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
CUMBERLAND COUNTY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WINDHAM ME
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CUMBERLAND COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WINDHAM POLICE DEPARTMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
NICHOLAS MANGINO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
VICKI MCKENNEY, individually, and as next friend of Stephen McKenney, and as personal representative of the Estate of Stephen McKenney
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 06 2017
OPINION issued by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge; Bruce M. Selya, Appellate Judge and Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge. Published. [17-1378] |
Docket last updated: 10/09/2017 4:31 AM EDT |
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #70) filed by Appellant Nicholas Mangino. Docketing Statement due 05/03/2017. Transcript Report/Order form due 05/03/2017. Appearance form due 05/03/2017. PLEASE NOTE: The December 1, 2016 amendment to the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure made significant changes to appellate practice. The full text of the amendments, as well as a summary of major rule changes, is available here. The changes went into effect on December 1, 2016. 17-1378 (GA) |