The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company v. Union Insurance Company
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Ellen L Hollander |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01095 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 5:8705 Declaratory Judgment - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 17, 2017 5:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Union Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Settlement Order
Thu 12/07 10:17 AM
ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/29/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
|
18 | 18
order
Settlement Order
Wed 11/29 4:13 PM
ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/29/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 11/29 11:53 AM
Telephone Conference re Settlement held on 11/29/2017 before Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 11/29 12:47 PM
Settlement Conference held on 11/29/2017 before Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order for Settlement Conference
Thu 06/29 4:17 PM
ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/29/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order for Settlement Conference
Fri 06/23 3:53 PM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/23/2017. (bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 06/23 12:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 12/22/2017. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/23/2017.(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order on Discovery | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 06/23 11:36 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for settlement. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/23/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 06/23 11:58 AM
Telephone Status Conference held on 6/22/2017 before Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (bas, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/15 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Erin Mullen on behalf of The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company (Mullen, Ashley) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Wed 06/07 10:58 AM
ORDER setting scheduling conference call, and attached draft scheduling order. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/7/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/07 8:57 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Union Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for Union Insurance Company.(DeBlasis, Samuel) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/07 8:54 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Union Insurance Company.(DeBlasis, Samuel) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 05/23 2:16 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/23/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 05/23 10:57 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Union Insurance Company(DeBlasis, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 05/23 2:17 PM
Reset Deadlines: Union Insurance Company answer due 6/7/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/16 9:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. Union Insurance Company served on 4/25/2017, answer due 5/16/2017.(Ferguson, Robert) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Mon 05/15 10:36 AM
QC NOTICE:5 Affidavit filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file using the civil event "summons returned executed" found under "Service of Process" in the "Initial Pleadings and Service" section. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Affidavit
Fri 05/12 4:25 PM
AFFIDAVIT Of Service by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company(Ferguson, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Business card of party who received service | ||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/21 11:23 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company (Ferguson, Robert) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/20 4:59 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Union Insurance Company.(dass, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Thu 04/20 4:58 PM
QC NOTICE re:1 Complaint filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. **Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement was scanned as part of the complaint. Please re-file the Disclosure using the civil event "Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement" found in "Other Documents". Please add affiliates when prompted. (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/20 3:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Union Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6617422.), filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company.(Ferguson, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |