Grieb v. Empty Wagon Properties Corp.
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Ellen L Hollander |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01097 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 17, 2017 5:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Empty Wagon Properties Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Grieb
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 80 minutes ago |
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Mon 08/28 4:21 PM
ORDER granting17 Joint Motion for Judicial Approval of Settlement and Dismissal of Action with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/28/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Supplemental
Mon 08/28 11:15 AM
Supplemental to17 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval filed by David Grieb (Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Settlement
Thu 08/24 12:30 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by Empty Wagon Properties Corp.(Berger, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 | ||
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Mon 08/21 10:42 AM
MARGINAL ORDER approving15 Joint Status Report filed by Empty Wagon Properties Corp.. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/18/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Fri 08/18 4:05 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Empty Wagon Properties Corp.(Berger, Russell) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Mon 07/17 3:42 PM
MARGINAL ORDER approving13 Status Report filed by Empty Wagon Properties Corp.; cancelling teleconference call set for 7/20/17; directing status report to be filed by 8/18/17 if case has not been approved for settlemetn by that date. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/14/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Fri 07/14 5:16 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Empty Wagon Properties Corp.(Berger, Russell) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
6
pgs
order
Memorandum to Parties
Wed 07/05 3:42 PM
MEMORANDUM to Counsel re: Telephone conference on scheduling order. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/5/2017.(krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum to Counsel | ||
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/03 5:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Empty Wagon Properties Corp..(Sawyer, Sarah) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/03 5:48 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Empty Wagon Properties Corp. (Sawyer, Sarah) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 06/15 2:24 PM
MARGINAL ORDER granting8 Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/14/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 06/14 3:14 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Empty Wagon Properties Corp..(Berger, Russell) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 06/05 11:52 AM
ORDER granting6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Empty Wagon Properties Corp. answer due 6/19/2017. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/2/2017. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 06/02 4:51 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Empty Wagon Properties Corp.(Sawyer, Sarah) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/02 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Sawyer on behalf of Empty Wagon Properties Corp. (Sawyer, Sarah) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/02 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Bradley Berger on behalf of Empty Wagon Properties Corp. (Berger, Russell) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 05/19 10:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Grieb. Empty Wagon Properties Corp. served on 5/12/2017, answer due 6/2/2017.(Davis, Benjamin) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 10:25 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Empty Wagon Properties Corp..(krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/20 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT for Wages Owed against Empty Wagon Properties Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6617600.), filed by David Grieb.(Davis, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement |