Van Field v. State of Maryland
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Paul W Grimm |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-01048 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 04/26 3:51 PM
MANDATE of USCA takes effect today as to3 Notice of Appeal filed by Raymond Calvin Van Field (krc, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
appeal
USCA Judgment
Wed 04/04 3:15 PM
JUDGMENT of USCA denying a certificate of appealability and dismissing this appeal as to3 Notice of Appeal filed by Raymond Calvin Van Field. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of this court's mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41.(krc, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Unpublished Opinion, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Judgment | ||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
appeal
Record to 4cca
Thu 07/27 4:21 PM
Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit -- Initial(krcs, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 07/26 12:12 PM
USCA Case Number 17-6949 for3 Notice of Appeal filed by Raymond Calvin Van Field. Case Manager - Karen Stump (krc, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 07/25 4:05 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re3 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(krc, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 07/25 4:02 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to2 Order Dismissing Case by Raymond Calvin Van Field. (krc, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 06/29 11:50 AM
ORDER DISMISSING1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/28/2017. (c/m 6/29/2017 tds, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 04/20 11:02 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Raymond Calvin Van Field.(ah4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |