Habiba v. Coven
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | I Leo Glasser |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02357 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 17, 2017 5:12 AM EDT |
Petitioner
Eslam Habiba
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Phyllis A. Coven
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 07/18 5:06 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Phyllis A. Coven against Eslam Habiba. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the action is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; and that each party is to bear its own costs,fees, including attorney's fees, and disbursements. Signed by Clerk of Court, by J. Hamilton, Deputy Clerk on 7/17/2017. (Layne, Monique) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 07/17 4:17 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, STIPULATED AND AGREED that this action be dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk shall enter judgment in accordance with this Stipulation and Order of Dismissal. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 7/17/2017. (Layne, Monique) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Mon 07/17 10:38 AM
Letter dated July 17, 2017 by Phyllis A. Coven (Kish, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal | ||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 06/26 2:02 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the complaint from July 5, 2017, to October 6, 2017. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 6/26/2017. (Kessler, Stanley) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 06/26 11:11 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's complaint from July 5, 2017, to October 6, 2017 by Phyllis A. Coven. (Kish, Ronald) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
utility
Email Test
Thu 05/25 10:01 AM
Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (Lee, Tiffeny) |
||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/15 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald W. Kish on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Kish, Ronald) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 05/08 11:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eslam Habiba. Phyllis A. Coven served on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/4/2017. (Yerman, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Online Proof of Delivery on U.S. Attorney Office EDNY | ||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 04/21 11:01 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 04/21 11:00 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 04/21 11:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Phyllis A. Coven, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Naturalization Hearing
Thu 04/20 1:00 PM
PETITION for Naturalization Hearing in the Nature of Mandamus filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9463963, filed by Eslam Habiba. (Yerman, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/21 10:57 AM
Case assigned to Judge I. Leo Glasser. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |