Salzberg v. City of New York
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brian M Cogan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02361 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:794 Rehabilitation Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 17, 2017 5:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
City of New York
Dept. of Sanitation c/o City Law Dept. 100 Church Street 4th Fl
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Priscilla Salzberg
191-10 37th Avenue
Flushing, NY 11358 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
Wed 09/27 12:19 PM
DECISION AND ORDER dated 9/27/17 denying plaintiff's22 Motion to Alter Judgment. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/27/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respoth
Reply in Support
Mon 09/18 11:43 PM
REPLY in Support re22 MOTION to Alter Judgment dated July 31, 2017 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rambadadt, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Docket Sheet | ||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 09/11 4:30 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION to Alter Judgment dated July 31, 2017 filed by City of New York. (Bi, Shirley) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Alter Judgment
Tue 08/29 12:47 AM
MOTION to Alter Judgment dated July 31, 2017 by Priscilla Salzberg. (Rambadadt, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A--Memorandum & Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B--Judgment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C--Second Amended Complaint | ||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 07/31 11:34 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dated 7/31/17 that Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs amended complaint is granted; and that the State and City law claims are dismissed without prejudice to re-filing in State Court. ( Ordered by Janet Hamilton, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 7/31/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
20 | 20
7
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Mon 07/31 10:12 AM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 7/31/17 that defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiffs amended complaint is granted. The State and City law claims are dismissed without prejudice to re-filing in State Court. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/31/2017 ) *forwarded for jgm (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Reply in Support
Fri 07/28 4:55 PM
REPLY in Support re15 First MOTION for pre motion conference seeking leave to file a motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by City of New York. (Bi, Shirley) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 07/28 4:03 PM
Letter MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Priscilla Salzberg. (Rambadadt, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Substitution of Attorney Form, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Authorization to File | ||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 07/21 11:47 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 First MOTION for pre motion conference seeking leave to file a motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Priscilla Salzberg. (Wade, Locksley) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Transcript
Fri 07/14 2:46 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 16, 2017, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber David R. Roy, Telephone number (718) 613-2609. Email address: drroyofcr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 8/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2017. (Roy, David) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Fri 07/07 4:43 PM
First MOTION for pre motion conference seeking leave to file a motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint by City of New York. (Bi, Shirley) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Fri 07/07 5:08 PM
ORDER deferring ruling on15 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. This filing is deemed to constitute defendant's motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's opposition is due 7/21/2017, and defendant's reply is due 7/28/2017. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/7/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Sunday, June 25, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Sun 06/25 4:57 PM
ORDER deferring ruling on11 Motion to dismiss. In light of the amended complaint having superseded the original complaint, defendant has the option of either addressing the amended complaint in its reply papers, or filing a new motion or answer. If it chooses the former, defendant may have until 7/6/17 to file its reply papers; plaintiff then will have seven days to file opposition and defendant will have four days for reply. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/25/2017. (Cogan, Brian) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 06/23 11:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION for pre motion conference seeking leave to file a motion to dismiss and to stay discovery Converted to Motion by Court Order filed by Priscilla Salzberg. (Wade, Locksley) |
|
13 | 13
15
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 06/23 11:07 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Priscilla Salzberg, filed by Priscilla Salzberg. (Wade, Locksley) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Tue 06/20 12:36 PM
Minute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held on 6/16/2017 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Fact discovery to be completed by 9/14/2017. No extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter: David Roy) (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 06/13 8:08 PM
Reset Hearing Time: Initial Status Conference previously set at 10:30 am on 6/16/2017 is reset to 4:30 pm in Courtroom 8D South. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Case Management Statement
Fri 06/09 12:27 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [Joint Letter] (Wade, Locksley) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Fri 06/09 10:50 AM
|
||
order
Order(Other)
Fri 06/09 11:23 AM
CORRECTED ORDER. The Premotion Conference is waived. Defendant's11 letter is deemed to constitute defendant's motion to dismiss. Plaintiff will file a response by 6/23/2017; defendant's reply due 6/27/2017. The Initial Status Conference will proceed as scheduled on 6/16/2017 and the parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the initial conference set forth at5 . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/9/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Thu 06/08 4:36 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference seeking leave to file a motion to dismiss and to stay discovery by City of New York. (Bi, Shirley) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 05/24 2:33 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference from June 2, 2017, to after the response to the Complaint by City of New York. (Bi, Shirley) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 05/24 3:13 PM
ORDER granting in part10 Motion to Adjourn. This Court does not require an answer to hold the Initial Status Conference since the answer rarely gives any useful information. Rather, this Court's requirement that the parties confer and submit a joint letter setting forth in detail their claims and defenses in this case will give a lot more information and thus create a lot more opportunity for discussion and planning than would an answer. Therefore, the Initial Status Conference is adjourned to 6/16/2017 at 10:30 am in Courtroom 8D South . By that time, defendant will have had six weeks to prepare for this Conference and the Court expects it to be fully prepared. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/24/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 05/12 5:43 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File a response to the complaint filed by Priscilla Salzberg. (Wade, Locksley) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 05/12 4:24 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File a response to the complaint by City of New York. (Bi, Shirley) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 05/12 8:24 PM
ORDER denying8 Motion for 30-day Extension of Time to Answer or Move. Having reviewed defendant's letter motion, the Court does not believe that 30 days will be sufficient for defendant to conduct the tasks outlined. Defendant is therefore granted until 7/14/17 to answer or move. However, the Initial Status Conference on 6/2/17 is going forward as no one has requested an adjournment, and the Court assumes that the parties will fully comply with the requirements for that conference that have been previously posted, and will be fully prepared to discuss their positions in this case. Plaintiff's counsel is advised that the failure to extend professional courtesies can be a double-edged sword, and the time may come in this case when plaintiff's counsel wants an extension. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/12/2017. (Cogan, Brian) |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/02 12:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shirley Wenwei Bi on behalf of City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Bi, Shirley) |
|
Sunday, April 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Sun 04/23 8:21 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Priscilla Salzberg. City of New York served on 4/21/2017, answer due 5/12/2017. (Wade, Locksley) |
|
Saturday, April 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Sat 04/22 6:00 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 6/2/2017 at 10:15 AM in Chambers 704S . SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/22/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 04/21 11:16 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 04/21 11:15 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Letter
Thu 04/20 2:03 PM
Summons Issued as to City of New York. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/20 1:50 PM
COMPLAINT against City of New York filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9464191 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Priscilla Salzberg. (Wade, Locksley) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/21 11:14 AM
Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |