Na v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dora Lizette Irizarry |
Referred: | Vera M Scanlon |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02362 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 29:623 Job Discrimination (Age) |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 17, 2017 5:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Na
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 05/04 9:31 AM
ORDER electronically endorsing27 . So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 5/4/2018. (Carosella, Christy) |
||
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 05/02 1:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Karen Na (Liddle, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
order
Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 04/09 9:19 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: At26 , Defendant states that this matter has settled. On or before 5/9/2018, the Parties will file their stipulation of dismissal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/9/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 04/06 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Blank, Shira) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 03/06 5:20 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion to Stay. In light of the Motion at25 , Discovery is stayed until 4/6/2018 to allow the parties to continue to pursue settlement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/6/2018. (Miller, Hannah) |
||
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Stay
Mon 03/05 7:36 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Blank, Shira) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 01/19 10:33 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. All discovery must be completed by 3/5/2018. On or before 3/12/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 4/12/2018, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 5/11/2018, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/19/2018. (Pearce, Jessica) |
||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 01/18 10:11 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Blank, Shira) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
13
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 11/16 9:55 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Protective Order with modifications shown in the attachment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/16/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 11/16 10:16 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 11/15/2017 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), fact discovery closes on 1/20/2018. On or before 1/20/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. Counsel will discuss computer information to be sure it's exchanged before the close of discovery. Counsel will continue settlement discussions. Plaintiff will respond to Defendant's offer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/15/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 11/15 4:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Status Conference held on 11/15/2017 in Courtroom 13A South. James Halter appearing for Plaintiff. Shira Blank appearing for Defendant. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #3:27-3:32; 3:40-3:43.) (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 11/09 9:58 AM
ORDER: The status conference currently scheduled for 11/15/17 will take place in 13A South instead of 504 North. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/9/2017. (Pearce, Jessica) |
||
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Wed 11/08 5:33 PM
Letter regarding the status of discovery by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Blank, Shira) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Fri 11/03 10:32 AM
Letter to The Honorable Vera M. Scanlon by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Blank, Shira) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order | ||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 08/14 9:01 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. As Mr. Halter notes at19 , this does not constitute a change in representation. Attorney Christine A. Palmieri terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/14/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 08/11 4:47 PM
Letter MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Karen Na. (Halter, James) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/11 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James William Halter on behalf of Karen Na (aty to be noticed) (Halter, James) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Tue 07/11 1:34 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Karen Na (Palmieri, Christine) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 06/29 8:51 AM
ORDER granting consent15 Motion to Adjourn Conference. RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel are advised that the Initial Conference currently scheduled for 7/14/2017 has been rescheduled to 7/21/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 504 North before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. The Parties are to refer to14 and must file the joint proposed scheduling order by 7/13/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/29/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 06/28 11:37 AM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Karen Na. (Palmieri, Christine) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/26 10:36 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 7/14/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 504 North. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 7/10/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/26/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/23 12:05 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Brown, Jeremy) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/23 12:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Brown, Jeremy) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 06/16 8:50 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. As Ms. Bolles notes at11 , this does not constitute a change in representation, as her former law firm will continue to represent Plaintiff. Attorney Krista Elizabeth Bolles terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/16/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/15 11:48 AM
Letter MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Karen Na by Karen Na. (Bolles, Krista) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/15 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christine A. Palmieri on behalf of Karen Na (aty to be noticed) (Palmieri, Christine) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/04 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shira M. Blank on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Blank, Shira) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/04 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Miller Brown on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Brown, Jeremy) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 05/03 2:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karen Na. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 4/24/2017, answer due 6/23/2017. (Bolles, Krista) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/21 3:25 PM
Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 04/21 3:24 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 04/21 3:24 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/21 3:24 PM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/20 2:15 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Karen Na (Bolles, Krista) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/20 2:13 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Karen Na (Bolles, Krista) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/20 2:05 PM
COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9464260 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Karen Na. (Bolles, Krista) |