P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation et al v. Hitachi Ltd. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brian M Cogan |
Referred: | Vera M Scanlon |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02368 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 17, 2017 5:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MT Picture Display Co., LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Toshiba America Consumer Products, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Panasonic Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Panasonic Corporation of North America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Philips Da Amazonia Industria Electronica LTDA.
|
|
Defendant
Philips Electronics Industries (Taiwan), LTD.
|
|
Defendant
Philips Electronics North America Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thai Crt Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
LP Displays International, LTD.
|
|
Defendant
Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samsung SDI America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samsung SDI Brasil LTDA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samsung SDI Co., LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samtel Color, LTD.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co. LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Seg Hitachi Color Display Devices, LTD.
|
|
Defendant
LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Toshiba Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Beijing Matsushita Color Crt Company, LTD.
|
|
Defendant
Toshiba America Information Systems Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Toshiba America Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hitachi America, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hitachi Asia, LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hitachi Displays, LTD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hitachi Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Irico Display Devices Co., LTD.
|
|
Defendant
Irico Group Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Irico Group Electronics Co., LTD.
|
|
Defendant
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
|
|
Plaintiff
Richard Reid
24079-038 FLORENCE ADMAX U.S. PENITENTIARY 5880 Highway State 67 PO BOX 8500
FLORENCE, CO 81226 |
|
Plaintiff
Jimmy Jahar Thule
518 George Road
Toms River, NJ 08753 |
|
Plaintiff
P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marta Cooperative of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Donnelly
JK5048 301 Instutition Dr.
Bellefonte, PA 16823 |
|
Plaintiff
Edward Breivik
1586 Lawrence Road
Lawrence, NJ 08648 |
|
Plaintiff
ABC Appliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Wirth
LA 2120 301 Instutition Dr.
Bellefonte, PA 16823 |
|
Plaintiff
Ramzi Yusef
5880 Highway 67
Florence, CO 81226 |
|
Special Master
Honorable Charles A. Legge
Two Embarcadero Center Suite 1500
San Francisco, CA 94111 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Samsung Electronics America Inc.
Terminated: 10/03/2013
|
|
Defendant
Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Terminated: 10/03/2013
|
|
Defendant
Tatung Company of America, Inc.
Terminated: 10/03/2013
|
|
Defendant
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
Terminated: 10/03/2013
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LG ELectronics Taiwan Taipei Co., LTD.
Terminated: 05/29/2012
|
|
Defendant
LG Electronics Inc.
Terminated: 05/24/2017
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
150 | 150
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 02/20 6:19 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ABC Appliance, Inc., CompuCom Systems Inc, Electrograph Technologies Corp., Interbond Corporation of America, Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-04504-BMC et al. (Isaacson, William) |
|
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 02/20 12:53 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. In light of MARTA and the Samsung defendants' Letter of Settlement121 in 18-cv-4879 and the subsequent Order of Dismissal125 in 17-cv-4504, plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by 2/27/2019 why this matter, all its member cases, and every party listed on the docket cannot be terminated. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/20/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-04504-BMC et al. (Weisberg, Peggy) |