In re The Hain Celestial Group, Inc., Stockholder Class and Derivative Litigation
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joanna Seybert |
Referred: | Anne Y Shields |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02351 |
Nature of Suit | 160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits |
Cause | 12:22 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 16, 2017 5:25 AM EDT |
Consol Defendant
Pasquale ("Pat") Conte
|
|
Consol Plaintiff
Gary Merenstein
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Jennifer Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard C. Berke
|
|
Defendant
Pasquale Conte
|
|
Defendant
Andrew R. Heyer
|
|
Defendant
Raymond W. Kelly
|
|
Defendant
Roger Meltzer
|
|
Defendant
Scott M. O'Neil
|
|
Defendant
Adrianne Shapira
|
|
Defendant
Irwin D. Simon
|
|
Defendant
The Hain Celestial Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Lawrence S. Zilavy
|
|
Plaintiff
Jenny Silva
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 07, 2023 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Tue 11/07 11:48 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Having considered the Parties' Joint November 6, 2023 Status Report (ECF No.94 ) and, in particular, the Parties' "request that the Court continue the temporary stay of the Derivative Action [ i.e. , this action] pending resolution of the Securities Class Action appeal," i.e. , E.D.N.Y. Case No. 16-CV-4581, the Court directs that the temporary stay in this case is extended through the earlier of November 8, 2024 or 30 days after the Second Circuit issues a decision in the Securities Class Action appeal. Further, by no later than earlier of November 8, 2024 or 30 days after the Second Circuit issues its decision , the Parties are to submit a Status Report with the Court providing an update of how they wish to proceed with this action in light of the procedural posture of the Securities Class Action appeal. Status Report due by 11/8/2024. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 11/7/2023. (PAK) |
||
Monday, November 06, 2023 | ||
94 | 94
misc
Status Report
Mon 11/06 4:49 PM
STATUS REPORT - Joint Status Report - by Richard C. Berke, Pasquale Conte, Andrew R. Heyer, Raymond W. Kelly, Roger Meltzer, Scott M. O'Neil, Adrianne Shapira, Irwin D. Simon, The Hain Celestial Group, Inc., Ross Weiner, Lawrence S. Zilavy (Hillebrecht, John) |