Auman v. Confide, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Vernon S Broderick |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02848 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 17, 2017 5:22 AM EDT |
Defendant
Confide, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Auman
|
Represented By
|
1. | The Trump administration's favorite gossip app is facing a lawsuit ? it's allegedly less private than it seems (businessinsider.com) |
Submitted Fri 04/21/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/17 3:42 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Benjamin Harris Richman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (Broderick, Vernon) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/16 11:41 AM
MOTION for Benjamin Harris Richman to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jeremy Auman.(Richman, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 05/16 7:54 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 10 MOTION for Benjamin Harris Richman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13666003. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit/Declaration Missing. Please Read Local Rule 1.3;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu) |
||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Tue 05/16 11:45 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 11 MOTION for Benjamin Harris Richman to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) |
||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/15 4:59 PM
MOTION for Benjamin Harris Richman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13666003. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jeremy Auman.(Richman, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing | ||
9 | 9
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 05/15 11:01 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for plaintiff Jeremy Auman, and counsel for defendant Confide, Inc. ("Confide") in the above-captioned action, that the time for Confide to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended from May 15, 2017 to and including June 14, 2017. Confide, Inc. answer due 6/14/2017. Motions terminated:7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Gavin J. Rooney dated May 12, 2017, filed by Confide, Inc. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/15/2017) (ap) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/12 2:55 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Laurence Dashiell on behalf of Confide, Inc.. (Dashiell, Craig) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 05/12 2:52 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Gavin J. Rooney dated May 12, 2017. Document filed by Confide, Inc..(Rooney, Gavin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/12 2:50 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gavin J. Rooney on behalf of Confide, Inc.. (Rooney, Gavin) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Tue 05/02 2:01 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Confide, Inc. served on 4/24/2017, answer due 5/15/2017. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Office of the NYS Dept. of State. Document filed by Jeremy Auman. |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/21 9:50 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Confide, Inc. (jvs) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/21 9:47 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (jvs) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/21 9:47 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. (jvs) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/21 9:47 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jvs) |
||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/20 12:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/20 11:52 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Confide, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeremy Auman. |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/20 11:42 AM
COMPLAINT against Confide, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13564049)Document filed by Jeremy Auman |