Lightle v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Donald C Coggins, Jr |
Referred: | Paige J Gossett |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01009 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Thu 07/25 11:37 AM
ORDER granting 36 Motion for Attorney Fees, awarding fees in the amount of $10,000.00. Signed by Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. on 07/25/2019.(bshr, ) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Fri 07/12 10:27 AM
RESPONSE in Support re36 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant ot 42 U.S.C. Section 406(b) Response filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Prince, Marshall) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 06/28 9:43 AM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Vickie Lightle. Response to Motion due by 7/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Duggan, John) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Supporting Documents Itemization of Services Rendered, | ||
Att: 3 Supporting Documents, | ||
Att: 4 Supporting Documents Copy of Awards Notice, | ||
Att: 5 Supporting Documents 1696, Fee Agreement, and 1695, | ||
Att: 6 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 7 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 04/16 4:30 PM
ORDER granting 27 Motion for Attorney Fees, awarding $4,451.48 in fees. Signed by Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. on 04/16/2019.(bshr, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Wed 01/02 3:33 PM
RESPONSE in Support re31 MOTION for Attorney Fees Response filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Prince, Marshall) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 12/21 4:22 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Vickie Lightle. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Duggan, John) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Urban Consumers Database CPI-U | ||
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order
Wed 12/12 3:57 PM
TEXT ORDER directing Plaintiff's counsel to file additional briefing on his hourly rate calculation in his 27 Motion for Attorney's Fees. Plaintiff's counsel is also directed to explain why his calculations are based on a pre-inflation adjusted hourly rate of $75 per hour as opposed to the $125 per hour enacted in March 1996 when the EAJA was amended. Further, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to use the appropriate Consumer Price Index values in the supplemental briefing. For the court's convenience, please show all work. Entered at the directions of the Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. on 12/12/2018. (bshr, ) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Mon 10/15 8:32 AM
RESPONSE in Support re27 MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act Response filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Prince, Marshall) |
|
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 10/01 10:20 AM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Vickie Lightle. Response to Motion due by 10/15/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Duggan, John) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Supporting Documents Itemization of Time Expended, | ||
Att: 3 Supporting Documents Bureau of Labor Statistics Chart, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 5 Supporting Documents Assignment of Fees | ||
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Judgment
Mon 09/10 3:37 PM
JUDGMENT / The court has ordered that the decision of the Commissioner is reversed pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and the action is remanded for further evaluation. (bshr, ) |
|
25 | 25
7
pgs
order
Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation
Mon 09/10 3:34 PM
OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION declining to adopt 16 Report and Recommendation, reversing the decision of the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and remanding the action for further evaluation. Signed by Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. on 09/10/2018. (bshr, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Reply Not to a Motion
Wed 05/23 9:05 AM
REPLY by Commissioner of Social Security Administration to20 Objection to Report and Recommendation, . (Prince, Marshall) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Fri 05/11 2:41 PM
OBJECTION to16 Report and Recommendation by Vickie Lightle. Reply to Objections due by 5/25/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (bshr, ). Modified on 05/11/2018 to correct event code(bshr, ) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 05/07 11:32 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's objections to the Report and Recommendation are due by May 11, 2018. Entered at the direction of Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. on 05/07/2018.(bshr, ) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 05/04 11:38 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Vickie Lightle. Response to Motion due by 5/18/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Duggan, John) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Report and Recommendation
Thu 04/19 3:56 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint - Social Security, recommending the decision of the Commissioner be affirmed. Objections to R&R due by 5/3/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 04/19/2018. (bshr, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Case Reassigned CV
Wed 12/13 4:41 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis no longer assigned to the case. (glev, ) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respoth
Defendant's Social Security Brief
Fri 12/08 2:22 PM
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Response Brief Due by 12/27/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Prince, Marshall) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respoth
Plaintiff's Social Security Brief
Mon 11/06 11:26 AM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF by Social Security Administrative Record. Defendant Brief due by 12/18/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Duggan, John) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 09/13 9:02 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting with consent 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 9/13/2017. (kkus, ) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 09/08 4:18 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Social Security Administrative Record. Response to Motion due by 9/22/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Duggan, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Social Security Administrative Record
Tue 08/29 9:35 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration .(Prince, Marshall) |
|
Att: 1 Addendum Medical Records - Part 5, | ||
Att: 2 Addendum Medical Records - Part 6, | ||
Att: 3 Addendum Medical Records - Part 7, | ||
Att: 4 Addendum Medical Records - Part 8, | ||
Att: 5 Addendum Medical Records - Part 9, | ||
Att: 6 Addendum Medical Records - Part 10 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Social Security Administrative Record
Tue 08/29 9:33 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration Volume 1 of 2 .(Prince, Marshall) |
|
Att: 1 Addendum Index, | ||
Att: 2 Addendum Documents Related to Admin. Process/Oral Hearing - Part 1, | ||
Att: 3 Addendum Documents Related to Admin. Process/Oral Hearing - Part 2, | ||
Att: 4 Addendum Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Addendum Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Addendum Non Disability Related Developments, | ||
Att: 7 Addendum Disability Related Developments, | ||
Att: 8 Addendum Medical Records - Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Addendum Medical Records - Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Addendum Medical Records - Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Addendum Medical Records - Part 4 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer in Social Security Case
Tue 08/29 9:28 AM
ANSWER by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Brief due by 9/28/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Prince, Marshall) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA-Social Security Complaint Served
Thu 05/11 10:16 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Social Security Administrative Record. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 5/1/2017, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 8/29/2017.(Duggan, John) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Certified Receipt: Civil Process Clerk, | ||
Att: 2 Supporting Documents Certified Receipt: Commissioner of SSA, | ||
Att: 3 Supporting Documents Certified Receipt: US Attorney General | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 04/20 10:10 AM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (bshr, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security Cases Only
Thu 04/20 10:08 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7109202.) Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Vickie Lightle. Service due by 7/18/2017(bshr, ) |