Rush-White v. Trans Union LLC et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | J Michelle Childs |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01017 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 17, 2017 5:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roslyn Rush-White
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Alltran Financial LP
Terminated: 05/22/2017
|
|
Defendant
American Express Bank FSB
Terminated: 06/27/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions Inc
Terminated: 06/27/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Terminated: 06/27/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 09/18 2:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Equifax Information Services, LLC by Roslyn Rush-White. (Maxfield, David) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
order
Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order
Wed 08/09 8:18 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE as to defendant Equifax Information Services LLC without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/9/2017. (asni, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 08/08 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to Equifax Information Services, LLC by Roslyn Rush-White (Maxfield, David) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 06/27 3:43 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE as to defendants Trans Union LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, American Express Bank FSB only without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Equifax Credit Information Services LLC terminated., Trans Union LLC, American Express Bank FSB and Experian Information Solutions Inc terminated. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/27/2017. (asni, ) |
|
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 06/27 9:15 AM
NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin as to Trans Union LLC, Only by Roslyn Rush-White (Maxfield, David) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 06/26 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to American Express Centurion Bank, Only by Roslyn Rush-White (Maxfield, David) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 06/26 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Only by Roslyn Rush-White (Maxfield, David) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 06/15 3:23 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer American Express Bank FSB answer due 7/21/2017. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/15/2017.(asni, ) |
|
33 | 33
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 06/15 3:05 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by American Express Bank FSB. Response to Motion due by 6/29/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Trautman, M Caroline) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 05/30 4:06 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur) |
|
30 | 30
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 05/30 3:19 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by American Express Bank FSB.(Trautman, M Caroline) |
|
29 | 29
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 05/30 1:57 PM
CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/9/2017, Fact Discovery duey by 11/9/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/18/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/22/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/12/2018, Expert Witness Discovery due by 2/15/2018, Motion in Limine due by 3/16/2018, Motions due by 2/16/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/16/2018, Pretrial Briefs due by 4/10/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 4/17/2018, ADR Statement due by 11/18/2017, Mediation Due by 12/18/2017, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/30/2017. (asni, ) |
|
28 | 28
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 05/30 12:38 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwingelberg, Lyndey) |
|
27 | 27
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 05/30 12:30 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Roslyn Rush-White.(Maxfield, David) |
|
26 | 26
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 05/30 12:25 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Roslyn Rush-White.(Maxfield, David) |
|
Att: 1 Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 05/22 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Alltran Financial, LP only by Roslyn Rush-White. refiled by the clerk to correct event type. (asni, ) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 05/22 10:49 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer American Express Bank FSB answer due 6/26/2017. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/22/2017.(asni, ) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 05/22 10:27 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by American Express Bank FSB. Response to Motion due by 6/5/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Trautman, M Caroline) |
|
20 | 20
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Mon 05/22 10:23 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American Express Bank FSB.(Trautman, M Caroline) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/08 9:10 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/8/2017.(asni, ) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 05/05 12:20 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/5/2017.(mbro, ) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Thu 05/04 6:00 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alexa Leigh Sendukas ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7137534) by Experian Information Solutions Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/18/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Zwingelberg, Lyndey) (asni, ) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Application for PHV Admission, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Att: 3 (5/8/2017) Exhibit certificate of good standing for Supreme Court | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 05/04 4:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responses to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories by American Express Bank FSB. Response to Motion due by 5/18/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Trautman, M Caroline) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 04/27 10:30 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Barker, Rita) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/27 10:27 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Barker, Rita) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 04/26 3:04 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by American Express Bank FSB. American Express Bank FSB answer due 5/22/2017. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 4/26/2017. (asni, ) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 04/26 2:22 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to1 Notice of Removal by American Express Bank FSB. Response to Motion due by 5/11/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Trautman, M Caroline) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Mediation Order
Tue 04/25 3:40 PM
MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 10/17/2017, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 4/25/2017. (asni, ) |
|
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 04/25 3:38 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/15/2017, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/30/2017, Rule 26 Report due by 5/30/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/10/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/9/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/8/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/8/2017, Discovery due by 10/10/2017, Motion in Limine due by 1/5/2018, Motions due by 10/24/2017, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/5/2018, Pretrial Briefs due by 1/30/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 2/6/2018, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 4/25/2017. (asni, ) |
|
8 | 8
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 04/25 3:17 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwingelberg, Lyndey) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/25 3:16 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwingelberg, Lyndey) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/25 12:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 04/20 3:32 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Roslyn Rush-White.(Maxfield, David) |
|
2 | 2
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 04/20 3:05 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(asni, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/20 3:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County, case number 2017-CP 40-01598 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4020-7112099), filed by Trans Union LLC.(asni, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Consents to Removal |