Patterson v. Stevens Aviation Inc
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-01022 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 17, 2017 5:44 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Stevens Aviation Inc
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Jeff Patterson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stevens Aviation Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Patterson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
49 | 49
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 09/04 1:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Jeff Patterson, Stevens Aviation Inc (Jefferson, Meliah) Modified on 9/4/2018 to add party listed as filer (alew, ) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 07/09 9:39 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' July 2, 2018 Joint Status Report. (ECF No. 40 .) The Court appreciates the parties keeping the Court updated on the status of the criminal case. In light of the July 9, 2018 sentencing hearing, the stay in this matter will expire July 16, 2018. If the parties feel an amendment to the scheduling order is needed in light of the stay, the Court asks the parties to meet and confer on a mutually agreeable scheduling order and submit it to the Court for consideration. Signed by Honorable A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr on 7/9/18. (alew, ) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 07/05 11:17 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 41 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Christopher Schoen for the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr on 7/5/18.(alew, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 07/03 2:52 PM
Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jeff Patterson. Response to Motion due by 7/17/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Jefferson, Meliah) (Main Document 41 replaced on 7/3/2018) (alew, ). Modified on 7/3/2018 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (alew, ) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Status Report
Mon 07/02 1:25 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jeff Patterson, Stevens Aviation Inc (Jefferson, Meliah) Modified on 7/2/2018 to add party listed as filer (alew, ) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 05/03 4:40 PM
Minute Entry. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held before Honorable A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr. with Attorneys Meliah Jefferson for plaintiff and Daniel Atkinson for defendant. The plaintiff in this case has entered a guilty plea in the criminal case in which he is a defendant, and the Presentence Investigation Report has been completed and filed, but the case has not been set for sentencing. The Court will allow the stay to continue pending sentencing on the criminal case; the parties may disregard the text order entered this date regarding the case trial status during the Court's next term, but are to prepare as much as possible to be ready to work on discovery as soon as the criminal matter is concluded. ORAL ORDER that the parties shall submit a Status Report in writing as to the status of sentencing in the criminal case by July 2, 2018. (sfla) |
|
37 | 37
order
Order
Thu 05/03 11:15 AM
TEXT ORDER: Due to the anticipated trial during the upcoming term of court in accordance with the operative scheduling order in this case, the parties are hereby ORDERED to jointly inform the Court in writing as of the status in this case. In the submission, the parties should set forth the following: 1) The nature of the case; 2) The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3) An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 4) Settlement probabilities; and 5) any outstanding scheduling issues, anticipated conflicts, and/or concerns for consideration by the Court. Said status submission must be filed on ECF within seven days of the date of this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr on 5/3/18. (alew, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Status Report
Wed 05/02 9:40 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Jeff Patterson. (Jefferson, Meliah) |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 04/26 8:15 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for Thursday, 5/3/2018 04:00 PM in Greenville before Honorable A Marvin Quattlebaum Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is to initiate the call and have all counsel on the line before calling chambers at 864-241-2190.(alew, ) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Case Reassigned CV
Thu 04/12 2:45 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr. Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance
Fri 03/02 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Michael BT Wilkes for April 27-May 2; May 23-May 25; June 1-June 12 (Wilkes, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order
Fri 02/23 8:51 AM
TEXT ORDER directing the parties to provide a status report regarding whether sentencing has taken place in the criminal case within 60 days. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 2/23/2018. (abuc) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Status Report
Thu 02/22 4:30 PM
STATUS REPORT by Stevens Aviation Inc. (Atkinson, Charles) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 02/15 12:58 PM
TEXT ORDER. A stay pending the resolution of a criminal indictment was entered in this case on August 31, 2017. It appears that the criminal matter has been resolved by the entering of a plea. Accordingly, the parties are directed to provide a status report regarding the continued need for a stay by February 22, 2018. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 2/15/2018. (abuc) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Case Reassigned CV
Wed 12/13 9:03 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 08/31 11:40 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 20 Motion to Stay this case until further order of this court. Entered at the direction of Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/31/17. (sfla) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Response to Motion Do not use if support or object to motion
Wed 08/30 5:24 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re20 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Criminal Indictment Response filed by Jeff Patterson.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/6/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Jefferson, Meliah) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Stay
Wed 08/16 3:46 PM
MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Criminal Indictment by Stevens Aviation Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Atkinson, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support Brief in Support of Motion to Stay, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Criminal Indictment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Amended Order Regulating Dissemination of Discovery | ||
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Mediation Order
Thu 07/06 10:01 AM
MEDIATION ORDER; Mediation Due by 2/14/2018. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 7/6/17. (sfla) |
|
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 07/06 10:01 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/5/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/6/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/6/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/8/2018, Discovery due by 2/7/2018, Motion in Limine due by 6/5/2018, Motions due by 2/21/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/18/2018, Pretrial Briefs due by 6/12/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 6/19/2018. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 7/6/17. (sfla) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Wed 07/05 6:39 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Jeff Patterson.(Jefferson, Meliah) |
|
Att: 1 LR 26.03 Answers and Discovery Plan, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
adr
ADR Statement/Certification
Wed 07/05 6:35 PM
ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Jeff Patterson(Jefferson, Meliah) |
|
14 | 14
adr
ADR Statement/Certification
Wed 07/05 4:22 PM
ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Stevens Aviation Inc(Atkinson, Charles) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Thu 06/15 6:40 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim10 by Jeff Patterson.(Jefferson, Meliah) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 05/31 10:44 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER; Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/20/2017, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/5/2017, Rule 26 Report due by 7/5/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/5/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/6/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/6/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/6/2017, Discovery due by 12/7/2017, Motion in Limine due by 2/28/2018, Motions due by 12/21/2017, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/12/2018, Pretrial Briefs due by 3/7/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 3/14/2018. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 5/31/17. (sfla, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Tue 05/30 4:06 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Jeff Patterson by Stevens Aviation Inc.(Atkinson, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 05/23 10:28 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stevens Aviation Inc.(Atkinson, Charles) |
|
8 | 8
discov
Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1
Tue 05/23 10:26 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Stevens Aviation Inc.(Atkinson, Charles) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/23 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Daniel Atkinson on behalf of Stevens Aviation Inc (Atkinson, Charles) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/23 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael BT Wilkes on behalf of Stevens Aviation Inc (Wilkes, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Tue 05/16 10:40 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeff Patterson. Stevens Aviation Inc served on 5/8/2017, answer due 5/30/2017.(Jefferson, Meliah) Modified on 5/16/2017 to remove duplicate word (sfla) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/20 5:53 PM
Summons Issued as to Stevens Aviation Inc. (sfla, ) |
|
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 04/20 5:53 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jeff Patterson.(sfla, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/20 5:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Stevens Aviation Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7112642) filed by Jeff Patterson. Service due by 7/19/2017(sfla, ) |