Manning v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Geiger Lewis |
Referred: | Bristow Marchant |
Case #: | 9:17-cv-01016 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Judgment
Wed 05/30 4:18 PM
JUDGMENT It is ordered that the decision of the Commissioner is affirmed. (egra, ) |
|
22 | 22
6
pgs
order
Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation
Wed 05/30 4:11 PM
ORDER RULING ON 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION It is ordered that the decision of the Commissioner is affirmed. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 05/30/2018. (egra, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Reply Not to a Motion
Wed 05/02 9:39 AM
REPLY by Commissioner of Social Security Administration to19 Objection to Report and Recommendation . (Prince, Marshall) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Wed 04/18 9:41 PM
OBJECTION to16 Report and Recommendation by David Alan Manning. Reply to Objections due by 5/2/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Creech, Margaret) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 04/04 4:27 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time. Objections due by April 18, 2018. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 04/04/2018. (egra, ) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 04/04 10:29 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time by David Alan Manning. Response to Motion due by 4/18/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Creech, Margaret) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Report and Recommendation
Thu 03/22 4:28 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint - Social Security,, filed by David Alan Manning. It is recommended that the decision of the Commissioner be affirmed. Objections to R&R due by 4/5/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 03/22/2018. (egra, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
respoth
Plaintiff's Social Security Response Brief
Tue 03/13 7:28 PM
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE BRIEF by David Alan Manning. (Creech, Margaret) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 02/27 10:22 AM
ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Response Brief due by March 13, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 02/27/2018. (egra, ) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 02/26 11:45 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time by David Alan Manning. Response to Motion due by 3/12/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Creech, Margaret) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
respoth
Defendant's Social Security Brief
Tue 02/13 3:05 PM
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Response Brief Due by 2/27/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Prince, Marshall) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
respoth
Plaintiff's Social Security Brief
Fri 01/05 9:15 PM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF by David Alan Manning. Defendant Brief due by 2/14/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Creech, Margaret) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 12/04 12:03 PM
ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Brief due January 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 12/04/2017.(egra, ) |
|
Sunday, December 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time
Sun 12/03 2:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by David Alan Manning. Response to Motion due by 12/18/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Creech, Margaret) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Social Security Administrative Record
Mon 11/06 10:41 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration .(Prince, Marshall) |
|
Att: 1 Addendum Index, | ||
Att: 2 Addendum Documents Related to Admin. Process/Oral Hearing, | ||
Att: 3 Addendum Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 4 Addendum Jurisdictional Documents and Notices - Part 1, | ||
Att: 5 Addendum Jurisdictional Documents and Notices - Part 2, | ||
Att: 6 Addendum Non Disability Related Developments, | ||
Att: 7 Addendum Disability Related Developments, | ||
Att: 8 Addendum Medical Records - Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Addendum Medical Records - Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Addendum Medical Records - Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Addendum Medical Records - Part 4, | ||
Att: 12 Addendum Medical Records - Part 5, | ||
Att: 13 Addendum Medical Records - Part 6 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer in Social Security Case
Mon 11/06 10:36 AM
ANSWER by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.Plaintiffs Brief due by 12/6/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Prince, Marshall) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA-Social Security Complaint Served
Thu 07/27 10:16 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Alan Manning. All Defendants.(Creech, Margaret) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 04/20 1:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (egra, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security Cases Only
Thu 04/20 1:51 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7112101.) Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by David Alan Manning. Service due by 7/19/2017 (egra, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/20/2017) (egra, ). Modified on 4/20/2017 to correct case number (egra, ) |