Slocum v. Wilson et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J P Stadtmueller |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00557 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 06, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 09/06 9:52 AM
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 9/6/2018: GRANTING20 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Dada R. Slocum at Gordon Correctional Center) (jm) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 09/04 4:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael A Mattioli, Scott A Wilson on Non-ECF Participant enclosing Brief in Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Gehling, Naomi) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 09/04 2:51 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by Michael A Mattioli, Scott A Wilson re20 MOTION to Dismiss Brief in Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss . (Gehling, Naomi) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss
Tue 07/31 2:34 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Against All Defendants by Dada R Slocum. (asc) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 05/01 1:28 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael A Mattioli, Scott A Wilson on Non-ECF Participant enclosing Notice of Appearance (Christopoulos, Elleny) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/01 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elleny B Christopoulos on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Elleny B. Christopoulos (Christopoulos, Elleny) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 01/30 8:53 AM
Due to non-consent, case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm) |
||
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 01/29 10:49 AM
Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by All Defendants. (Gehling, Naomi) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 01/26 3:16 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 1/26/18. Amendment of Pleadings due by 4/27/2018; Discovery due by 7/27/2018; Dispositive Motions due by 8/27/2018. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff via USPS)(mlm) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 01/22 12:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael A Mattioli, Scott A Wilson enclosing Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff (Gehling, Naomi) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Prisoner Complaint
Mon 01/22 11:56 AM
ANSWER to Prisoner Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Michael A Mattioli, Scott A Wilson.(Gehling, Naomi) |
|
notice
Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate
Mon 01/22 4:20 PM
NOTICE from the clerk to Defendants requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed by February 2, 2018; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm) |
||
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 12/29 2:33 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael A Mattioli - Waiver sent on 11/22/2017. (blr) |
|
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 12/29 2:33 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott A Wilson - Waiver sent on 11/22/2017. (blr) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
US Marshal 285 Form
Wed 12/27 4:39 PM
US Marshal 285 Form for Scott A. Wilson and Michael A. Mattioli - waiver of service not returned or filed on Pacer. (mlm) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Thu 11/02 4:19 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 11/2/2017. Daniel Smokovich, Reynaldo Roman, Bradley Nickel,Sean Patyk, and the City of Milwaukee are DISMISSED as defendants in this action. This case shall be Referred back to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin for further proceedings. (cc: Plaintiff via US Mail)(Griesbach, William) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 11/02 4:22 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Chief Judge William C Griesbach no longer assigned to the case. (mac) |
||
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Transmit Complaint/Notice/Waiver
Fri 10/20 1:40 PM
TRANSMIT Complaint, Order, Notice, Waiver to US Marshal for service upon Scott A. Wilson and Michael A. Mattioli. (mlm) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
13
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Thu 10/19 3:06 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/18/17. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Slocum's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee (ECF No.2 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint and this order upon Milwaukee Police Officers Scott A. Wilson and Michael A. Mattioli. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the remaining defendants shall file a responsive pleading to the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties may not begin discovery until after the court enters a scheduling order setting deadlines for discovery and dispositive motions. (continued below)... (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, Warden) (mlm) Modified on 10/19/2017 (mlm) |
|
motion
Report and Recommendations ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 10/19 3:16 PM
...(continued from ECF 8 ) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/18/17. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Slocum's failure to intervene claim against Daniel Smokovich, Reynaldo Roman, and Bradley Nickel be dismissed. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Slocum's Fifth Amendment claim against Sean Patyk be dismissed. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Slocum's Monell claim against the City of Milwaukee be dismissed. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Slocum's due process claim against Scott Wilson, Michael Mattioli, Daniel Smokovich, Reynaldo Roman, Bradley Nickel, and Sean Patyk be dismissed. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Daniel Smokovich, Reynaldo Roman, Bradley Nickel, Sean Patyk, and the City of Milwaukee be dismissed as defendants in this action. Case reassigned to Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, Warden)(mlm) |
||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 06/29 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address as to Dada R Slocum. Mr. Slocum moved to Gordon Correctional Center. (address updated on docket) (mlm) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
misc
Initial Partial Filing Fee Received
Fri 05/12 9:31 AM
INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $2.26, receipt number MK4689-065557. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl) |
||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/26 3:21 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Dada R Slocum. (mlm) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Mon 04/24 4:25 PM
ORDER that on or before 5/16/17 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 2.26 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 4/24/17. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, Warden )(mlm) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate
Thu 04/20 2:41 PM
LETTER from the clerk to Dada R. Slocum re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed by May 11, 2017. (mlm) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Thu 04/20 12:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Dada R Slocum. (mlm) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Thu 04/20 12:22 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dada R Slocum. (mlm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Prisoner
Thu 04/20 12:19 PM
PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Dada R Slocum.(mlm) |
|
Att: 1 Certification as to Three or More Dismissals |