Center for Biological Diversity v. Zinke et al
Alaska District Court | |
Judge: | Sharon L Gleason |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00091 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 17, 2017 1:44 AM AKDT |
Amicus
State of Nebraska
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Louisiana
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Kansas
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Indiana
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Arkansas
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Arizona
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Nevada
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Oklahoma
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of South Carolina
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Texas
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Utah
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Wisconsin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ryan Zinke
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Department of the Interior
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Kurt Whitehead
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
State of Alaska Department of Law
1031 West 4th Avenue, Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501 |
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Safari Club International
501 Second Street NE
Washington, DC 20002 |
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Pacific Legal Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
National Rifle Association of America
11250 Waples Mill Road
Fairfax, VA 22030 |
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Joe Letarte
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Alaska Outdoor Council
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Big Game Forever
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Center for Biological Diversity
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM AKDT |
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
135 | 135
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 02/21 9:17 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to131 Notice of Appeal filed by Center for Biological Diversity: The judgment of this court dated 12/30/2019, takes effect this date. AFFIRMED IN PART; DISMISSED IN PART. (BJK, COURT STAFF) |