In Re: Koplow
Original Case: 1:17-mc-91029
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-civil-01370 |
Type | civil / private / other statutes |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 03, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 04, 2018 3:26 AM EST |
Petitioner - Appellant
DAVID LEE KOPLOW
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/04/2018 3:26 AM EST |
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #6) filed by Appellant David Lee Koplow. PLEASE NOTE: The December 1, 2016 amendment to the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure made significant changes to appellate practice. The full text of the amendments, as well as a summary of major rule changes, is available here. The changes went into effect on December 1, 2016. 17-1370 (KC) |