Estate of George R. Junior, et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., et al
Original Case: 1:17-cv-10460
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-civil-01395 |
Type | civil / private / real property |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 28, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 29, 2020 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE, INC., d/b/a America's Servicing Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KORDE & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HARMON LAW OFFICES, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Trustee for Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Trust 2006-AR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-AR5
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee of Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust 2006-4
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
OCWEN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION, as Trustee for Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Trust 2006-AR5, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-AR5, f/k/a Bank of New York, as successor to JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ESTATE OF GEORGE R. JUNIOR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRUCE JUNIOR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
KAZAR KEUCHKARIAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
LISA C. KEUCHKARIAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
EDWARD M. FLAHERTY, II
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2020 4:32 AM EDT |
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #44) filed by Appellants Estate of George R. Junior, Edward M. Flaherty, II, Bruce Junior, Kazar Keuchkarian and Lisa C. Keuchkarian. Docketing Statement due 05/04/2017. Appearance form due 05/04/2017. PLEASE NOTE: The December 1, 2016 amendment to the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure made significant changes to appellate practice. The full text of the amendments, as well as a summary of major rule changes, is available here. The changes went into effect on December 1, 2016. 17-1395 (CMP) |