Compulife Software, Inc. v. One Resource Group Corporation et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Dave Lee Brannon |
Case #: | 9:17-cv-80499 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:0501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:39 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
American Web Designers Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Compulife Software, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
American Web Designers Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
One Resource Group Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anthony Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Todd J. Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Binyomin Rutstein, a/k/a Ben Rutstein
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Barney
1509 Paradise Camp Road
Harrodsburg, KY 40330 |
|
Defendant
MBM Life Quotes, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian P. McSweeney, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Moses Newman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Rutstein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Compulife Software, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Robert Barney
1509 Paradise Camp Road
Harrodsburg, KY 40330 |
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
American Web Designers Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 08, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 06/08 10:21 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER adopting185 Report and Recommendation and denying177 Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Judgment. The parties have filed notices at docket entries188 and189 stating that they do not intend to object to the Report and Recommendation. The Court has conducted a de novo review of the Report and Recommendation and the record and concludes that the Report and Recommendation is well reasoned and correct. Accordingly, the Report and Recommendation is adopted as the Order of the Court, and Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/8/2022. (sk01) |
||
Thursday, June 02, 2022 | ||
189 | 189
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 06/02 8:52 AM
NOTICE by American Web Designers Ltd. re185 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re177 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment of Dismissal filed by Compulife Software, Inc. Recommending that Plaintiffs motion to set aside the judgment of dismissal with prejudice (ECF No. 177) be DENIED.. (Friedman, Allison) |