Lopez Lozano v. Abikat Construction LLC et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | J Mark Coulson |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01101 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
Abikat Construction LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William Yi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cristofer Raul Lopez Lozano
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Mon 04/09 9:42 AM
ORDER granting37 Joint Motion for Judicial Approval of Settlement and Dismissal of Action With Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 4/9/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Settlement
Fri 04/06 12:10 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and Dismissal of Action with Prejudice by Cristofer Raul Lopez Lozano(Garcia, Eduardo) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
corresp
Magistrate Judge - consent to
Thu 02/22 3:42 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Amelung, Courtney) |
|
34 | 34
corresp
Magistrate Judge - consent to
Thu 02/22 2:58 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Garcia, Eduardo) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 02/06 4:33 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for all Proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 2/6/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk) |
|
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 02/06 12:06 PM
Settlement Conference held on 2/6/2018 before Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 01/23 3:18 PM
ORDER staying discovery regarding jurisdictional facts pending the settlement conference. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/23/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Status Report
Wed 01/17 12:17 PM
STATUS REPORT by Cristofer Raul Lopez Lozano(Garcia, Eduardo) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Status Report Order
Mon 01/08 10:00 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/5/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order
Tue 01/02 9:28 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER rescheduling the Settlement Conference from October 13, 2017 to February 6, 2018. All guidelines in ECF 17 remain in effect with the exception that ex parte letters are now due in Chambers by January 23, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 1/2/2018. (daws, Chambers) |
|
28 | 28
order
Order
Tue 01/02 9:26 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER rescheduling the Settlement Conference from September 29, 2017 to February 6, 2018. All guidelines in ECF 17 remain in effect with the exception that ex parte letters are now due in Chambers by January 23, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 1/2/2018. (daws, Chambers) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel
Tue 10/10 9:44 AM
ORDER APPOINTING PRO BONO COUNSEL Courtney Blair Amelung for William Yi. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/6/2017. (c/m)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (c/s docket sheet, complaint, reimbursement form on 10/10/2017)(srd, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order
Tue 10/03 4:06 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: Per Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Stay October 13, 2017 Settlement Conference (ECF No. 25), the parties are directed to confer and submit proposed dates to the Court for rescheduling of the settlement conference. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Proceedings for 60 Days Except for October 13, 2017 Settlement Conference (ECF No. 19) is denied as moot on the issue of staying the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/3/2017. (daws, Chambers) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 10/02 3:33 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re19 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 60 Day Except for October 13, 2017 Settlement Conference and Opposed Motion to Stay October 13, 2017 Settlement Conference for 60 Days filed by Cristofer Raul Lopez Lozano.(Garcia, Eduardo) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Correspondence
Mon 10/02 2:26 PM
Correspondence to William Yi re: Local Rule 101.2 entitled "Withdrawal of Appearance".(c/m 10/2/17 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 10/02 2:19 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Russell A Gray and Joyce E Smithey terminated. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 9/29/2017. (c/m 10/2/17 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 10/02 2:15 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Stay Proceedings for 60 days except for the October 13, 2017 settlement conference. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 10/2/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Shorten Time
Mon 10/02 10:18 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting20 Motion to Shorten Time. Plaintiff's opposition to ECF No. 19 due 10/2/17. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 10/2/2017. (vdcs, Chambers) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
ShortenTime
Wed 09/27 4:50 PM
Consent MOTION to Shorten Time For Response to Opposed Motionto Stay October 13, 2017 Settlement Conference for 60 Days by Abikat Construction LLC, William Yi(Smithey, Joyce) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
motion
Stay
Wed 09/27 4:48 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 60 Day Except for October 13, 2017 Settlement Conference and Opposed Motion to Stay October 13, 2017 Settlement Conference for 60 Days by Abikat Construction LLC, William Yi(Smithey, Joyce) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 09/27 4:45 PM
Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joyce E. Smithey, Esq, Russell Gray, Esq., and Rifkin Weiner Livingston LLC by Abikat Construction LLC, William Yi(Smithey, Joyce) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order for Settlement Conference
Mon 08/21 11:15 AM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/21/2017. (daws, Chambers) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 08/18 2:18 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for settlement. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 8/18/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order
Fri 08/18 2:14 PM
ORDER re: Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 8/18/2017. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 07/25 9:01 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Abikat Construction LLC, William Yi.(Gray, Russell) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 07/11 5:28 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cristofer Raul Lopez Lozano.(Garcia, Eduardo) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Memorandum to Parties
Mon 07/10 1:44 PM
MEMORANDUM to Counsel. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 7/10/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 06/27 8:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Abikat Construction LLC, William Yi(Gray, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 06/14 1:41 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answers due 6/27/17.. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 6/14/2017. (vdcs, Chambers) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 06/13 4:36 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Abikat Construction LLC, William Yi(Gray, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 05/30 5:32 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Abikat Construction LLC answer due 6/13/2017; William Yi answer due 6/13/2017. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 5/30/2017. (vdcs, Chambers) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 05/30 2:48 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Abikat Construction LLC, William Yi(Gray, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/30 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Russell A Gray on behalf of Abikat Construction LLC, William Yi (Gray, Russell) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/30 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joyce E Smithey on behalf of Abikat Construction LLC, William Yi (Smithey, Joyce) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/10 11:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cristofer Raul Lopez Lozano. William Yi served on 5/6/2017, answer due 5/30/2017.(Lombardo, Mary) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/10 11:17 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cristofer Raul Lopez Lozano. Abikat Construction LLC served on 5/6/2017, answer due 5/30/2017.(Lombardo, Mary) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/21 1:55 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Abikat Construction LLC, William Yi.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/21 1:03 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6619165.), filed by Cristofer Raul Lopez Lozano.(Lombardo, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |