Hayes v. TransUnion
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | George Levi Russell, III |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01108 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporti |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
TransUnion
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip C. Hayes
P.O. Box 151
Glen Burnie, MD 21060 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order
Wed 08/09 1:30 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 25 Stipulation of Dismissal in GLR 17-1105 filed by TransUnion. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/9/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 8/9/17-das) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Settlement Order
Tue 08/01 4:34 PM
ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/31/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Mon 07/10 3:04 PM
ORDER granting17 Agreed Motion to Consolidate; consolidating Civil Case Numbers 17-cv-1105-GLR, 17-cv-1107-GLR and 17-cv-1108-GLR as a single action in 17-cv-1105-GLR. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/10/2017. (c/m 7/10/17) (krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order for Settlement Conference
Fri 06/30 3:02 PM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 6/30/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Consolidate Cases
Fri 06/23 2:19 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Agreed) by TransUnion(Ferguson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum In Support Of Agreed Motion To Consolidate, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16
motion
Consolidate Cases
Fri 06/23 1:57 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Agreed) by TransUnionAssociated Cases: 1:17-cv-01105-GLR, 1:17-cv-01107-GLR, 1:17-cv-01108-GLR(Ferguson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum In Support Of Agreed Motion To Consolidate, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Thu 06/01 2:18 PM
ORDER Modifying Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/31/2017. (c/m 6/1/17)(krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 05/26 8:19 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for Settlement. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/26/2017 (cags, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Mon 05/22 4:36 PM
ORDER memorializing agreements reached during teleconference re: mediation and expert testimony. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/22/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 5/22/17-das) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Mon 05/22 3:39 PM
Telephone Conference re: Scheduling held on 5/18/2017 before Judge George Levi Russell, III (kam, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Tue 05/16 3:57 PM
STATUS REPORT REGARDING COURT'S MEMORANDUM TO THE PARTIES 10 by TransUnion(Ferguson, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response
Thu 05/04 6:06 PM
RESPONSE re8 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by TransUnion.(Stichel, Henry) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/27 3:28 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by TransUnion.(Stichel, Henry) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/25 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Schuckit on behalf of TransUnion (Schuckit, Robert) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Standing Order Concerning Removal
Mon 04/24 9:01 AM
Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 4/24/2017. (c/m 4/24/17) (kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Correspondence
Mon 04/24 8:57 AM
Correspondence to Phillip Hayes re: Removal Notification Letter(kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
corresp
Miscellaneous
Fri 04/21 4:38 PM
(FILED IN ERROR- Wrong case) Removal Notification Letter mailed to Plaintiff. (dass, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/21/2017 (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/21 3:59 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by TransUnion identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Advent International Corp., Other Affiliate GS Capital Partners for TransUnion.(kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/21 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by TransUnion (kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/21 3:51 PM
Summons Issued as to TransUnion.(kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/21 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT against TransUnion, filed by Phillip C. Hayes.(kr2, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/21/2017 (kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/21 3:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Maryland for Anne Arundel County, case number D-07-CV-17-002492. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637097356), filed by TransUnion.(kr2, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/21/2017 (kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Remark - State Court Docs
Fri 04/21 3:55 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2 through 4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE District Court of Maryland for Anne Arundel County. (kr2, Deputy Clerk) |