Ferebee v. Lexy Dept. Store
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Paul W Grimm |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-01071 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2017 5:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
Lexy Dept. Store
|
|
Plaintiff
Ms. Renee (COG) Ferebee
P.O. Box 712
Temple Hills, MD 20757 |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 06/29 1:58 PM
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT; granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/28/2017. (c/m 06/29/2017 jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Response
Wed 05/10 3:48 PM
RESPONSE re3 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions filed by Renee (COG) Ferebee.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Attachments | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Case Management Order
Tue 04/25 12:58 PM
Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/25/2017. (c/m 04/25/2017 jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/21 11:45 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Renee (COG) Ferebee(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/21 11:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Lexy Dept. Store, filed by Renee (COG) Ferebee.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Attachments |