sapienza v. theroux
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Richard G Stearns |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-10703 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 01, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
Alexander Theroux
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marie Sapienza
|
Represented By
|
1. | Former New Hampshire legislator files lawsuit alleging Phillips Academy Andover teacher sexually abused her (bostonglobe.com) |
Submitted Mon 04/24/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
service
Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
Thu 03/01 2:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Alexander Theroux re16 Stipulation of Dismissal . (Welnicki, Matthew) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 03/01 1:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Alexander Theroux. (Welnicki, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 11/29 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Gordon on behalf of Marie Sapienza (Gordon, William) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 09/12 10:00 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. In light of the parties mediation schedule, the pretrial schedule is altered as follows: All fact discovery to be completed by 3/19/18; Plaintiff's expert witness(es), if any, to be designated and Rule 26(a)(2) reports filed no later than 4/2/18. Defendant's expert witness(es), if any, to be designated and Rule 26(a)(2) reports filed no later than 4/16/18. All expert discovery completed by 5/17/18. The dispositive motion schedule remains the same as it appears that experts will be part of this case, dispositive motions, if any, must be filed by 5/11/18, with opposition by 6/1/18. Reply only with leave of court. (Zierk, Marsha) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 09/11 12:59 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/19/2018 to Complete Discovery and to Amend Scheduling Order by Marie Sapienza.(Garabedian, Mitchell) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/07 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Welnicki on behalf of Alexander Theroux (Welnicki, Matthew) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Fri 06/23 10:30 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Answer having been filed in this case, the court enters the following pretrial schedule. Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) will be completed by 7/6/17; Motions for leave to Amend Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 9/29/17; All fact discovery to be completed by 1/19/18; Plaintiff's expert witness(es), if any, to be designated and Rule 26(a)(2) reports filed no later than 2/22/18. Defendant's expert witness(es), if any, to be designated and Rule 26(a)(2) reports filed no later than 3/16/18. All expert discovery completed by 4/20/18. Dispositive motions, if any, must be filed by 5/11/18, with opposition by 6/1/18. Reply only with leave of court. If no experts are utilized, dispositive motions will be filed by 2/22/18, with any opposition by 3/15/18. (Zierk, Marsha) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Joint statement re scheduling conference
Thu 06/22 2:49 PM
JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference .(Garabedian, Mitchell) |
|
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Local Rule 16.1(d)(3) Certification | ||
9 | 9
discov
Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26
Thu 06/22 9:29 AM
Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Alexander Theroux.(Mazurczak, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
discov
Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1
Thu 06/22 9:28 AM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Mazurczak, Michael) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice - Other
Thu 06/08 11:26 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. The parties are to file, no later than June 22, 2017 a joint statement containing a proposed pretrial schedule.(Seelye, Terri) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Orders | ||
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/01 3:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Alexander Theroux.(Mazurczak, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Wed 05/10 3:46 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Marie Sapienza. Alexander Theroux served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017. Acknowledgment filed by Marie Sapienza. (Garabedian, Mitchell) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/03 12:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Mazurczak on behalf of Alexander Theroux (Mazurczak, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 10:05 AM
Summons Issued as to alexander theroux. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Flaherty, Elaine) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 04/24 10:02 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Pacho, Arnold) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/21 4:57 PM
COMPLAINT against alexander theroux Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6593009 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by marie sapienza.(Garabedian, Mitchell) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 JS45 |