5
|
|
5
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 10/19 12:37 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: An Order of Honorable Pamela K. Chen, United States District Judge, having been filed on October 19, 2017, dismissing the action without prejudice due to Plaintiff having failed to file a Long Form as directed by the Court on August 29, 2017; and directing the Clerk of Court to enter judgment and terminate this case accordingly; it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the action is dismissed without prejudice; and that this case is terminated. Ordered by J. Poveda Deputy Clerk of Court on 10/19/2017. (Basnight, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 10/19 10:00 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Plaintiff having failed to file a Long Form as directed by the Court on August 29, 1017, this action is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment and terminate this case accordingly. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 10/19/2017. (Abdallah, Fida)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 08/29 2:43 PM
ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached, Plaintiff is granted (28) days' leave from the entry of this Order to file a Long Form application to proceed without prepayment of fees or to pay the $400 filing fee in order to proceed further with this action. Plaintiff should state his source of income or explain how he is able to pay his expenses and provide full support to his wife and daughter without having any income. The Clerk of Court shall send a Long Form IFP application to Plaintiff along with this Order. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 8/29/2017. (Abdallah, Fida)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 04/21 9:52 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael J. Kneitel. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT against Howard Koeppel, Gonzolo Orozco, Tony Perez, filed by Michael J. Kneitel. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|