Potts et al v. Postal Trucking Company
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Vera M Scanlon |
Referred: | Vera M Scanlon |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02386 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
Postal Trucking Company
1230 McCarter Highway
Newark, NJ 07104 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Clifton B Finkle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Clarke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alberto Florentino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Billy J. Potts
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 03/25 2:47 PM
ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' letter at ECF No.132 . By 4/8/2024, Plaintiffs' counsel must file a status report confirming that they received the entire settlement amount from Defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/25/2024. (CC) |
||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
132 | 132
misc
Letter
Fri 03/22 2:07 PM
Letter Regarding Breach of Settlement Agreement by Brian Clarke, Alberto Florentino, Billy J. Potts (Bisceglie, Angelo) |