McDonald v. Comerica Bank
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond J Dearie |
Referred: | Robert M Levy |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02401 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1601 Truth in Lending |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Comerica Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
D'Asiah McDonald
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 08/16 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: the above captioned action is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(l)(A)(i). SO Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 8/16/2017. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/15 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by D'Asiah McDonald (Denerstein, Evan) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 07/26 4:28 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Comerica Bank. (Beh, Han) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 07/26 9:34 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/26/2017. (Levy, Robert) |
||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/26 11:43 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/11/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 6/26/2017. (Marino, Janine) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 06/26 11:36 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Comerica Bank: answer due by 7/26/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 6/26/2017. (Marino, Janine) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 06/23 10:55 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Comerica Bank. (Beh, Han) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 06/01 11:19 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Comerica Bank. (Beh, Han) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/01 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Kevin Lenci on behalf of Comerica Bank (aty to be noticed) (Lenci, Edward) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/01 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Han Sheng Beh on behalf of Comerica Bank (aty to be noticed) (Beh, Han) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 06/01 2:15 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 6/1/2017. (Levy, Robert) |
||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 05/25 3:33 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis SO Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 5/25/2017. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/25 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Evan J Denerstein on behalf of D'Asiah McDonald (aty to be noticed) (Denerstein, Evan) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/25 9:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Comerica Bank. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/24 10:07 PM
Proposed Summons. by D'Asiah McDonald (Coffey, Carolyn) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/24 2:38 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/24 2:27 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
notice
Notice(Other)
Mon 04/24 2:17 PM
NOTICE - Counsel is advised Summons submitted is blank. Please forward a completed Summons. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/21 4:26 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by D'Asiah McDonald. (Coffey, Carolyn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/21 4:11 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by D'Asiah McDonald. (Coffey, Carolyn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/24 2:11 PM
Case assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |