Ortiz v. Threeline Imports, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Cheryl L Pollak |
Referred: | Cheryl L Pollak |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02411 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
Malvina Kerzhner
|
|
Defendant
Threeline Imports, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Noel Ortiz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/21 4:41 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, That this action having been resolved by the parties, and whereas, no party hereto in an incompetent, this action is hereby discontinued with prejudice pursuant to FRCP including to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/21/2017. (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/18 8:53 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Noel Ortiz (Hassan, Abdul) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Tue 07/18 9:55 AM
ORDER granting8 re9 : Having reviewed the parties' submission and the Settlement Agreement, conducted a settlement conference and a fairness hearing with the parties, and being familiar with the issues involved in this case, the Court finds the settlement and amount allocated to attorneys' fees as indicated in Settlement Agreement to be fair and reasonable under all the factors and hereby approves the settlement. The parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal by August 18, 2017 . (finding as moot7 as per8 ) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/18/2017. (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/17 2:31 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak for all further proceedings. Judge William F. Kuntz, II no longer assigned to case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
utility
Case No Longer Referred
Mon 07/17 2:29 PM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
||
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/13 8:09 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Noel Ortiz. (Hassan, Abdul) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Fairness/Cheeks Conference
Wed 07/12 2:18 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Fairness/Cheeks proceeding re7 -8 held before MJ Pollak on 7/12/2017. Fairness hearing held. Decision reserved. (Tape #12:02-12:09) (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Affidavit/Affirmation
Tue 07/11 7:48 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re Order,, (Proof of Service of June 30, 2017 Order) by Noel Ortiz (Hassan, Abdul) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Fri 06/30 10:34 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re11 : Plaintiff's counsel's request to appear by telephone at the fairness hearing set for 7/12/2017 is denied. Plaintiff is directed to appear at the fairness hearing along with counsel. To the extent that defendants have counsel, counsel is directed to file a notice of appearance and appear at the hearing. Otherwise, defendant Malvina Kerzhner is directed to appear at the fairness hearing. Plaintiff's counsel is Ordered to serve a copy of this Order to plaintiff and defendants and provide proof of service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/30/2017. (Rao, Sony) |
||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Mon 06/26 8:58 PM
STATUS REPORT by Noel Ortiz (Hassan, Abdul) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
order
~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 06/22 12:37 PM
ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: A Fairness/Cheeks Conference has been set for 7/12/2017 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 13B South before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/22/2017. (Rao, Sony) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Referring Motion
Wed 06/21 2:27 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: On June 18, 2017, the plaintiff in this action submitted a fully executed settlement agreement. Dkt. 9. Plaintiff's motion for settlement approval, Dkt. 8, is hereby respectfully REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Pollak for a fairness hearing on the proposed settlement agreement as per Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015). So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 6/20/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
Sunday, June 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Sun 06/18 1:45 PM
Letter Supplement - Motion for Approval (ECF No. 8) by Noel Ortiz (Hassan, Abdul) |
|
Att: 1 Fully Executed Settlement Agreement | ||
Sunday, June 04, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Settlement
Sun 06/04 5:54 PM
MOTION for Settlement (Approval) - ECF No. 8 replaces ECF No. 7 by Noel Ortiz. (Hassan, Abdul) |
|
Att: 1 Ex. 1 - Settlement Agreement | ||
7 | 7
motion
Settlement
Sun 06/04 1:32 PM
MOTION for Settlement Approval by Noel Ortiz. (Hassan, Abdul) |
|
Att: 1 Settlement Agreement | ||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/30 9:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noel Ortiz. Malvina Kerzhner served on 5/5/2017, answer due 5/26/2017. (Hassan, Abdul) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Thu 05/25 9:55 AM
ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a status letter to this Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Status Report due by 6/26/2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/25/2017. (Caggiano, Diana) |
||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 05/08 3:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noel Ortiz. Threeline Imports, Inc. served on 4/26/2017, answer due 5/17/2017. (Hassan, Abdul) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/24 2:55 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/24 2:54 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 2:54 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/21 5:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Malvina Kerzhner, Threeline Imports, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9469378 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Noel Ortiz. (Hassan, Abdul) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/24 2:53 PM
Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |