SCHNALL, P.E., v. THE CITY OF NEW YORK, DEPARTMENT OF BUILDINGS et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lashann Dearcy Hall |
Referred: | Lois Bloom |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02412 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 15, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:19 AM EDT |
Defendant
Adam Aaron Architect, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rick D. Chandler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City of New York, Department of Buildings
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Adam Wapniak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Schnall, P.E.,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 01/15 3:20 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorney's fees, costs and expenses. SO Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 1/14/2019. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
15
pgs
misc
Settlement Agreement
Wed 11/07 2:31 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT With Stipulation And Order of Discontinuance by Rick D. Chandler, The City of New York, Department of Buildings (Koplik, Pamela) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 10/22 5:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Settlement Conference held on 10/22/2018. (FTR Log #11:34-3:10.) (Burks, Jory) |
||
order
Status Report Order
Mon 10/22 5:42 PM
ORDER: The Court held a settlement conference in this matter on October 22, 2018. The parties settled the case on the record. The parties shall file a stipulation discontinuing the case by November 28, 2018. The parties are commended on their efforts to resolve the case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 10/22/2018. (Burks, Jory) |
||
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 09/14 2:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Status Conference held on 9/13/2018. (FTR Log #10:52-11:42.) (Burks, Jory) |
||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 09/14 2:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court held a status conference in this matter on September 13, 2018. As discussed on the record, the Court shall hold a settlement conference on October 22, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South. Plaintiff is directed to attend the settlement conference with his counsel. Defendants' counsel shall have someone with full settlement authority in Court. The Comptroller's Office may be available by telephone throughout the conference. Settlement conferences are most productive if the parties have made good faith efforts to settle the case prior to the conference. Accordingly, the parties shall engage in at least two substantive discussions regarding settlement before the settlement conference. The parties shall fax their confidential settlement statements setting forth the legal and factual basis for their settlement positions and their most recent best faith demands and offers to the Court at 718-613-2175 by October 15, 2018. Discovery is stayed until the October 22, 2018 settlement conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 9/14/2018. (Burks, Jory) |
||
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 08/03 12:48 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Telephone Conference held on 8/3/2018 (FTR Log #10:04-10:26.) (DeAtley, Tavish) |
||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 08/03 12:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court held a telephone status conference on August 3, 2018. As discussed on the record, defendants shall produce the outstanding discovery by September 7, 2018. The Court shall hold a status conference on September 13, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 8/3/2018. (DeAtley, Tavish) |
||
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 08/02 5:47 PM
ORDER: Although short notice, the Court respectfully requests that Ms. Koplik's supervisor be on the line for the telephone status conference scheduled tomorrow, August 3, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. After establishing contact with defendants' counsel, plaintiff's counsel shall telephone the Court at (718) 613-2170.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 8/2/2018. (DeAtley, Tavish) |
||
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Letter
Mon 07/30 1:20 PM
Letter response by Rick D. Chandler, The City of New York, Department of Buildings (Koplik, Pamela) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Initial Disclosures | ||
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 07/25 9:47 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re29 Letter filed by Scott Schnall, P.E., By letter-motion dated July 24, 2018, plaintiff raises several discovery issues. ECF No.29 . Defendants shall respond by July 30, 2018. The Court shall hold a telephone status conference on August 3, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. After establishing contact with defendants, plaintiff's counsel shall telephone the Court at (718) 613-2170.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 7/25/2018. (DeAtley, Tavish) |
||
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Letter
Tue 07/24 5:05 PM
Letter to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom by Scott Schnall, P.E., (Theis, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 05/29 12:28 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part28 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: By letter-motion dated May 24, 2018, the parties jointly request a four-month extension of time to complete discovery. ECF No.28 . The request is granted in part and denied in part. The parties shall complete all discovery by September 17, 2018. The parties shall file a joint status letter by August 30, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/29/2018. (DeAtley, Tavish) |
||
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 05/24 2:39 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Rick D. Chandler, The City of New York, Department of Buildings. (Koplik, Pamela) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
16
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Fri 02/16 4:42 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER, granting26 Motion for Protective Order: Any party intending to file any document under seal must first apply to the Court for permission to do so . SO ORDERED as modified in paragraph 16. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on February 16, 2018. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Protective Order
Thu 02/15 4:33 PM
MOTION for Protective Order and Stipulation by Scott Schnall, P.E.,. (Theis, Brett) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 02/02 1:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Telephone Conference held on 2/2/2018 (FTR Log #11:06-11:23.) (DeAtley, Tavish) |
||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 02/02 1:52 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court held a telephone status conference in this matter on February 2, 2018. As discussed on the record, the parties shall complete all discovery by June 18, 2018. Plaintiff shall produce any medical authorizations by February 15, 2018. The parties shall file a mutual confidentiality order by February 15, 2018. Any amended complaint must be filed by March 5, 2018. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 (b)(3)(A). The Court encourages the parties to discuss settlement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 2/2/2018. (DeAtley, Tavish) |
||
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 01/11 2:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Telephone Conference held on 1/11/2018 (FTR Log #11:03-11:20.) (DeAtley, Tavish) |
||
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 01/11 2:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court held a telephone status conference on January 11, 2018. As discussed on the record, plaintiff shall provide defendants a demand by January 18, 2018. The Court shall hold a telephone status conference on February 2, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. After establishing contact with defendants, plaintiff's counsel shall telephone the Court at (718) 613-2170. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 1/11/2018. (DeAtley, Tavish) |
||
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Thu 01/04 2:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Initial Telephone Conference Hearing held on 1/4/2018 (FTR Log #12:37-1:24.) (DeAtley, Tavish) |
||
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 01/04 2:20 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court held an initial telephone conference on January 4, 2018. As discussed on the record, the parties are encouraged to discuss settlement. The Court shall hold a telephone status conference on January 11, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. After establishing contact with defendants, plaintiff's counsel shall telephone the Court at (718) 613-2170. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 1/4/2018. (DeAtley, Tavish) |
||
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 01/03 3:17 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Rick D. Chandler, The City of New York, Department of Buildings. (Koplik, Pamela) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 01/03 5:18 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part25 Motion to Adjourn Conference: In light of the weather forecast, defendants' counsel requests an adjournment of tomorrow's initial conference. ECF No.25 . Plaintiff's counsel consents. The request is granted in part and denied in part. The Court shall hold the initial conference by telephone. Plaintiff's counsel shall establish contact with defendants' counsel at 12:30 p.m. and then telephone the Court at 718-613-2170. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 1/3/2018. (DeAtley, Tavish) |
||
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 12/21 6:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court shall hold an initial conference on January 4, 2018 at 12:30 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures by January 2, 2018. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. A request for an adjournment must be received in writing at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 12/21/2017. (DeAtley, Tavish) |
||
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 12/20 9:53 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/20/2017. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
order
1 - Terminate Hearings
Tue 12/19 6:36 PM
ORDER: Due to a conflict the in person initial conference scheduled for 12/20/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Bulsara is hereby adjourned sine die. The Conference will be reschedule accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/19/2017. (Manson, Eddie) |
||
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Case Management Statement
Fri 12/15 1:05 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Discovery Plan Worksheet (Koplik, Pamela) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 11/16 5:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person initial conference will be held at 10:30 AM on 12/20/2017 in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two (2) days before 12/20/2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/16/2017. (Manson, Eddie) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/15 12:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Rick D. Chandler, The City of New York, Department of Buildings. (Koplik, Pamela) |
|
Att: 1 51 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 11 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 4 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 09/05 4:51 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Marziliano, August) |
||
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 08/16 9:52 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Rick D. Chandler, The City of New York, Department of Buildings. (Koplik, Pamela) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 08/16 10:12 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendants Rick D. Chandler and The City of New York, Department of Buildings shall answer the Complaint by 9/15/2017 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/16/2017. (Blase, Brendan) |
||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/07 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Scott Schnall, P.E., OF SECOND AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION ONLY (Theis, Brett) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Mon 08/07 12:09 PM
Letter TO HON. HALL by Scott Schnall, P.E., (Theis, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF SECOND AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION ONLY | ||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/04 4:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal for the Wapniak Defendants by Scott Schnall, P.E., (Theis, Brett) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference
Fri 08/04 10:12 AM
MINUTE ENTRY AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court held a pre-motion conference on August 2, 2017 regarding the City Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss. In light of the August 1, 2017 letter informing that a settlement was reached between Plaintiff and the Wapniak Defendants, Plaintiff shall file a stipulation of dismissal as to the Wapniak Defendants by August 4, 2017. Plaintiff shall advise the Court as to what, if any, agreement was reached regarding whether Plaintiff intends to dismiss any claims and whether the City Defendants intend to move to dismiss any claims by August 7, 2017. If the City Defendants move to dismiss the Complaint, the briefing schedule is as follows: Defendants' opening papers must be served by August 16, 2017; Plaintiff's opposition papers must be served by September 13, 2017; and Defendant must file its reply, if any, and the fully briefed motion by September 27, 2017. If Plaintiff narrows his claims and the City Defendants move to dismiss, the page limits for the briefs are as follows: fifteen (15) pages for the opening brief; fifteen (15) pages for the opposition; and five (5) pages for the reply, if any. The parties are reminded that this Court's Individual Practices require that courtesy copies be delivered to Chambers at the time of service. (Court Reporter Holly Driscoll.) (Valentin, Winnethka) |
||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Tue 08/01 1:22 PM
Letter Ltr re Settlement of Wapniak defendants by Adam Aaron Architect, P.C. (Cooper, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Mon 07/17 7:19 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The City Defendants' June 16, 2017 letter motion for a pre-motion conference14 regarding their anticipated motion to dismiss is hereby GRANTED. The Court will hold a pre-motion conference on August 2, 2017, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4H North. The Court will order a briefing schedule during the pre-motion conference. The parties should anticipate a schedule that will require service of the motion within a short time after the pre-motion conference (usually two weeks). Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 7/17/2017. (Figueroa, Tiffani) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Fri 06/23 8:44 PM
Letter to Hon. LaShann DeArcy Hall by Scott Schnall, P.E., (Theis, Brett) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 06/21 3:59 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference to July 17, 2017 by Scott Schnall, P.E.,. (Theis, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 - Email chain showing consents | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings
Wed 06/21 4:16 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting15 : The Initial Conference previously set for 7/12/2017 is adjourned sine die , pending plaintiff filing an amended complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/21/2017. (Singer, Jacob) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Fri 06/16 9:34 AM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Rick D. Chandler, The City of New York, Department of Buildings. (Koplik, Pamela) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference
Wed 06/07 4:43 PM
MINUTE ENTRY: The Court held a pre-motion conference on June 5, 2017 concerning Defendant Adam Aaron Architect, P.C. and Defendant Adam Wapniak's anticipated motion to dismiss. Brett Theis appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Jonathan Cooper appeared on behalf of Defendant Adam Aaron Architect, P.C. and Defendant Adam Wapniak. Pamela Koplick appeared on behalf of the City Defendants. The Court granted Plaintiff's request to file an amended complaint. A deadline to file the amended complaint will be set after a pre-motion conference on the City Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss, if any. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 6/7/2017.(Court Reporter Stacy Mace.) (Valentin, Winnethka) |
||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Wed 05/24 6:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant Adam Aaron Architect, P.C. and Defendant Adam Wapniak's May 9, 2017 letter motion for a pre-motion conference9 regarding their anticipated motion to dismiss is hereby GRANTED. The Court will hold a pre-motion conference on June 5, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 4H North. The Court will order a briefing schedule during the pre-motion conference. The parties should anticipate a schedule that will require service of the motion within a short time after the pre-motion conference (usually two weeks). Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 5/24/2017. (Figueroa, Tiffani) |
||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Tue 05/16 12:04 PM
Letter Responding to Wapniak's 5/9/17 Letter by Scott Schnall, P.E., (Theis, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 05/16 10:59 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A Initial Conference is set for 7/12/2017 @ 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/16/2017. (Caggiano, Diana) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Mon 05/15 11:11 AM
Letter to Hon. Pollak by Scott Schnall, P.E., (Theis, Brett) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 05/15 12:53 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part and denying in part10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Defendants City of New York, Department of Buldings and Rick D. Chandler are to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by June 16, 2017 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/15/2017. (Singer, Jacob) |
||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 05/12 3:28 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Rick D. Chandler, The City of New York, Department of Buildings. (Koplik, Pamela) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Tue 05/09 9:53 AM
First MOTION for pre motion conference re1 Complaint, Letter Request for Pre-Motion Conference by Adam Aaron Architect, P.C., Adam Wapniak. (Cooper, Jonathan) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/09 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M Cooper on behalf of Adam Aaron Architect, P.C., Adam Wapniak (aty to be noticed) (Cooper, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 05/05 4:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Schnall, P.E.,. All Defendants. (Theis, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service | ||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/28 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Ann Koplik on behalf of Rick D. Chandler, The City of New York, Department of Buildings (aty to be noticed) (Koplik, Pamela) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order of Recusal
Mon 04/24 4:16 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge James Orenstein recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak for all further proceedings. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/24/2017. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 1:12 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/24 1:10 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/24 1:09 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/24 1:09 PM
Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
25
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/21 5:52 PM
COMPLAINT is against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9469382 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by SCOTT SCHNALL, P.E.,. (Theis, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Proposed Summons Summons in a Civil Action |