P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation et al v. Technicolor SA et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brian M Cogan |
Referred: | A Kathleen Tomlinson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02367 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 17, 2017 5:13 AM EDT |
Interested Party
Toshiba America , Inc
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Toshiba America Consumer Products, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Toshiba America Information Systems Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Toshiba Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmy Jahar Thule
518 George Road
Toms River, NJ 08753 |
|
Plaintiff
Richard Reid
24079-038 FLORENCE ADMAX U.S. PENITENTIARY 5880 Highway State 67 PO BOX 8500
FLORENCE, CO 81226 |
|
Plaintiff
P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marta Cooperative of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Donnelly
JK5048 301 Instutition Dr.
Bellefonte, PA 16823 |
|
Plaintiff
Edward Breivik
1586 Lawrence Road
Lawrence, NJ 08648 |
|
Plaintiff
ABC Appliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Wirth
LA 2120 301 Instutition Dr.
Bellefonte, PA 16823 |
|
Plaintiff
Ramzi Yusef
5880 Highway 67
Florence, CO 81226 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., LTD.
Terminated: 05/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Videocon Industries, Ltd.
Terminated: 05/30/2017
|
|
Defendant
Technologies Displays Americas LLC
Terminated: 05/19/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Technicolor USA, Inc.
Terminated: 05/19/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Technicolor SA
Terminated: 05/19/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA, Inc.
Terminated: 05/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
Terminated: 05/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc.
Terminated: 05/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
Terminated: 05/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V.
Terminated: 05/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.
Terminated: 05/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD
Terminated: 05/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samsung SDI America, Inc.
Terminated: 05/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samsung SDI Brasil LTDA
Terminated: 05/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |