Jones v. Lettieri Construction, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Denis R Hurley |
Referred: | Arlene R Lindsay |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02407 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
Debra Lettieri
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas Lettieri
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lettieri Construction, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark S. Jones
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Wed 10/17 10:52 AM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, this Court has reviewed the March 12, 2018 Report and Recommendation at DE23 of Judge Lindsay ("R&R") for clear error, and finding none, now concurs in both its reasoning and its result. Accordingly, this Court adopts the R&R as if set forth herein. In response to the R&R, the Parties filed a corrected Negotiated Settlement Agreement on August 10, 2018 at DE26 . The corrected Negotiated Settlement Agreement is hereby approved. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 10/17/2018. (Bochner, Francesca) |
||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 10/18 11:01 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE; Case closed. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 10/17/2018. (Cubano, Jazmin) |
||
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Expedite
Tue 10/16 3:36 PM
First MOTION to Expedite Approval of Settlement Agreement by Mark S. Jones. (Leinoff, Michael) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 08/13 9:45 AM
ORDER terminating25 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 8/13/2018. (Bochner, Francesca) |
||
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Settlement Agreement
Fri 08/10 1:16 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Cover Letter by Mark S. Jones (Leinoff, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Settlement and Release Document, | ||
Att: 2 Pre-Bill Showing Hours Worked | ||
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 08/09 2:09 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Settlement by Mark S. Jones. (Leinoff, Michael) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Fri 08/03 9:29 AM
ORDER re24 Letter filed by Mark S. Jones: Plaintiff is directed to make the typographical changes, and file the updated Settlement Agreement on or before August 10, 2018. The Court will review the R&R and determine whether to approve the Settlement Agreement after that time. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 8/3/2018. (Bochner, Francesca) |
||
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Thu 08/02 1:49 PM
Letter Requesting Status Update by Mark S. Jones (Leinoff, Michael) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 03/12 4:47 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re22 : See attached Report and Recommendation for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 3/12/2018. (Lanin, Debbie) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Settlement Agreement
Thu 03/01 1:56 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Cover Letter by Mark S. Jones (Leinoff, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Settlement and Release Document, | ||
Att: 2 Pre-Bill Showing Hours Worked | ||
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order(Other)
Fri 01/26 11:29 AM
ORDER re20 : The parties are directed to file supplemental papers in support of their proposed settlement on or before February 16, 2018. See attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 1/26/2018. (Lanin, Debbie) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Tue 11/28 5:01 PM
ORDER re20 : The Settlement Agreement is respectfully REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay to issue a Report & Recommendation. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 11/28/2017. (Bochner, Francesca) |
||
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Settlement Agreement
Mon 11/27 12:18 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Mark S. Jones (Leinoff, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement For Approval | ||
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 10/18 11:52 AM
ORDER re19 : The matter is stayed for thirty days. The parties are directed to submit their settlement documents to District Judge on or before November 20, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/18/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Stay
Tue 10/17 2:05 PM
First MOTION to Stay Discovery Proceedings pending settlement by Mark S. Jones. (Leinoff, Michael) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 09/08 2:37 PM
ORDER re17 : The application is granted. See the attached Amended Scheduling Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 9/8/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 09/06 12:28 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Schedule issued by the Court by Mark S. Jones. (Leinoff, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 06/30 11:58 AM
FLSA INITIAL DISCOVERY AND MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 6/30/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice(Other)
Fri 06/09 10:46 AM
NOTICE by Debra Lettieri, Thomas Lettieri, Lettieri Construction, Inc. re14 NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email (Kraft, Ruth) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Email
Tue 06/06 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Change of Firm by Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft (Kraft, Ruth) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice(Other)
Tue 05/30 4:12 PM
NOTICE by Debra Lettieri, Thomas Lettieri, Lettieri Construction, Inc. NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION (Kraft, Ruth) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
Tue 05/30 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Debra Lettieri, Thomas Lettieri, Lettieri Construction, Inc. (Kraft, Ruth) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/30 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft on behalf of Debra Lettieri, Thomas Lettieri, Lettieri Construction, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Kraft, Ruth) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/30 4:06 PM
VERIFIED ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Debra Lettieri, Thomas Lettieri, Lettieri Construction, Inc.. (Kraft, Ruth) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/30 10:01 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark S. Jones. Debra Lettieri served on 5/15/2017, answer due 6/5/2017. (Leinoff, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/30 10:00 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark S. Jones. Thomas Lettieri served on 5/15/2017, answer due 6/5/2017. (Leinoff, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/30 9:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark S. Jones. Lettieri Construction, Inc. served on 5/15/2017, answer due 6/5/2017. (Leinoff, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/25 10:33 AM
Summons Issued as to Debra Lettieri, on 04/25/2017. (Fagan, Linda) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/25 10:26 AM
Summons Issued as to Thomas Lettieri, on 04/25/2017. (Fagan, Linda) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/25 10:21 AM
Summons Issued as to Lettieri Construction, Inc., on 04/25/2017. (Fagan, Linda) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/24 4:51 PM
Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Mark S. Jones (Leinoff, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons on Lettieri Construction, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons on Thomas Lettieri, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons on Debra Lettieri | ||
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/24 4:30 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
notice
Notice(Other)
Mon 04/24 4:28 PM
Proposed summonses are rejected; the date on each summons is incorrect as it is added by the Clerk's Office as of the date of issuance; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summonses with an incorrect date. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summonses without the date using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/24 4:28 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/24 4:30 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/21 5:47 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9469412 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Mark S Jones. (Leinoff, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Lettieri Construction, Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Thomas Lettieri, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Debra Lettieri, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A, First Salary Breakdown, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B, Second Salary Breakdown |