Reiter v. Maxi-Aids, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sandra J Feuerstein |
Referred: | Gary R Brown |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02417 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability) |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
Maxi-Aids, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elliot Zaretsky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barry Reiter
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/02 10:21 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice and Without Costs by Hildee Reiter (Rahman, Tanvir) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/12 4:00 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re37 - Application granted to the extent that the case is closed with leave to reopen on 10 days notice no later than 8/13/2019. Motion17 is denied without prejudice to renewal should the cause be reopened. SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 7/12/2019. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Letter
Thu 07/11 6:58 PM
Letter re Settlement Agreement in Principle by Hildee Reiter (Rahman, Tanvir) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/02 5:39 PM
Electronic ORDER: The status conference scheduled for 7/10/19 is adjourned to 9/26/19 at 11:15 a.m. in courtroom 1010 of the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 7/2/2019. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia) |
||
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Wed 05/29 10:02 AM
ORDER : Due to a conflict in the court's calendar today's conference is moved to 1:30 p.m..Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 5/29/2019. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
minutes
Motion Hearing Discovery Hearing Docket Call Order on Motion to Compel
Fri 05/31 11:54 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown: Motion Hearing held on 5/29/2019 re28 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Confirm Deposition Dates filed by Hildee Reiter. Counsel for all sides present. Ruling placed on the record granting28 Motion to Compel. (FTR Log #1:49-1:57.) (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 05/06 10:37 AM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Correction of Dates by Maxi-Aids, Inc., Elliot Zaretsky. (Lopez, Joan) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 05/06 4:05 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting35 Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting36 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Applications granted. The status conference is adjourned to 05/29/2019 at 11:00 am. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 5/6/2019. c/ecf (Gilpin, Daniel) |
||
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 05/03 3:56 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Hildee Reiter. (Rahman, Tanvir) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/29 3:05 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a change in the court's calendar the 5/1/2019 Status Conference is adjourned to 5/8/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/29/2019. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/19 11:10 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re28 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Confirm Deposition Dates. A conference is hereby scheduled before the undersigned on 05/01/2019 at 3:30 pm. The parties are directed to meet and confer (in person or by telephone) prior to the conference, in an effort to resolve and/or narrow any outstanding discovery issues. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/19/2019. c/ecf (Gilpin, Daniel) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 04/16 2:07 PM
Electronic ORDER: The status conference scheduled for 4/18/19 is adjourned to 7/10/19 at 11:15 a.m. in courtroom 1010 of the Central Islip courthouse.Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 4/16/2019. (Disbrow, Sandra) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Letter
Fri 04/12 2:35 PM
Letter re April 18, 2019 Status Conference by Barry Reiter (Rahman, Tanvir) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Mon 04/15 1:12 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion to Substitute Party - Motion granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to substitute Hildee Reiter as plaintiff and to reinstate motion17 . SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 4/11/2019. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Tue 03/26 4:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re30 Notice of MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Barry Reiter. (Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Barry Reiter Certificate of Death, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Surrogate's Court Letter | ||
31 | 31
3
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Tue 03/26 4:48 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re30 Notice of MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Barry Reiter. (Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Substitute Party
Tue 03/26 4:47 PM
Notice of MOTION to Substitute Party by Barry Reiter. (Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 01/28 12:58 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER withdrawing24 Motion to Stay. This motion is deemed withdrawn, without prejudice to refiling, after substitution of the proper party. See DE 29; Electronic Order dated Jan. 25, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/28/2019. c/ecf (Gilpin, Daniel) |
||
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 01/25 4:41 PM
Electronic ORDER terminating17 Motion to Dismiss. The motion will be reinstated upon determination of the anticipated Rule 25 motion for substitution of the proper party. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 1/25/2019. (Disbrow, Sandra) |
||
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 01/18 7:41 PM
Electronic ORDER: The status conference scheduled for 1/23/19 is adjourned to 4/18/19 at 11:15 a.m. in courtroom 1010 to allow for the substitution for plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 1/18/2019. (Disbrow, Sandra) |
||
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Letter
Thu 01/17 1:26 PM
Letter re Passing of B. Reiter by Barry Reiter (Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 11/08 1:52 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: The status conference scheduled for 11/14/18 is adjourned to 1/23/19 at 11:15 a.m. in courtroom 1010 of the Central Islip courthouse. (Disbrow, Sandra) |
||
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Compel
Tue 10/02 4:48 PM
MOTION to Compel Defendants to Confirm Deposition Dates by Barry Reiter. (Rahman, Tanvir) |
|
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 09/28 10:48 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: In light of the pending motion, the status conference scheduled for 10/1/18 is further adjourned to 11/14/18 at 11:15 a.m. in courtroom 1010 of the Central Islip courthouse. (Disbrow, Sandra) |
||
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 09/27 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the conference originally scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 10/1/2018 is converted into a telephone conference at 12:15 pm. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the conference call to 631-712-5630. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this notice on all parties upon receipt. c/ecf (Morabito, Bryan) |
||
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Thu 09/06 9:16 AM
ORDER granting27 Motion to Adjourn Conference: The conference is adjourned to 10/1/2018 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 at the Central Islip Courthouse. A briefing schedule for any dispositive motions will be set at the conference. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 9/6/2018. c/ECF (Adell, April) |
||
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 09/05 12:09 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Barry Reiter. (Rahman, Tanvir) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Wed 07/11 9:41 AM
Letter Re: Pending Motion for Stay and Dismissal by Maxi-Aids, Inc., Elliot Zaretsky (Frank, Keith) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 07/03 2:37 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: In light of the Defendants' pending motion to dismiss, the Status Conference scheduled for 7/12/18 is adjourned. A control date conference is scheduled for 9/13/18 at 11:15 AM. (Roman, Joshua) |
||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
order
1 - Terminate Hearings
Mon 06/25 3:44 PM
ORDER: In light of the conference scheduled before Judge Feuerstein, the 7/11/2018 conference before Judge Brown is adjourned without date.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/25/2018. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 06/12 11:29 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 Letter MOTION to Stay filed by Barry Reiter. (Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Stay
Thu 06/07 9:33 AM
Letter MOTION to Stay by Maxi-Aids, Inc.. (Frank, Keith) |
|
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Thu 06/07 10:00 AM
Incorrect Entry Information - Notice of Hearing entered on 6/7/2018 was inadvertently filed in this case. Notice was removed from the docket. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
||
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 04/12 9:02 AM
ORDER re23 Letter filed by Maxi-Aids, Inc., Elliot Zaretsky: The application is granted. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 4/12/2018. c/ECF (Adell, April) |
||
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Wed 04/11 10:38 AM
Letter /Letter Application for Extension of Time by Maxi-Aids, Inc., Elliot Zaretsky (Frank, Keith) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 04/09 9:57 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 7/12/2018 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. c/ECF (Adell, April) |
||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 04/06 10:29 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kenneth D. Sommer terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/6/2018. c/ecf (Meehan, James) |
||
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/05 5:03 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. Judge Leonard D. Wexler no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Kramer, Michael) |
||
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 01/12 4:09 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kenneth D. Sommer by Barry Reiter. (Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Declaration
Mon 12/18 4:13 PM
DECLARATION re17 MOTION to Dismiss ,19 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,20 Memorandum in Support,18 Memorandum in Opposition Reply Declaration of Keith J. Frank in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss and In Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition by Maxi-Aids, Inc., Elliot Zaretsky (Frank, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit N - Pages from the Second Deposition | ||
20 | 20
15
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Mon 12/18 4:10 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re17 MOTION to Dismiss ,19 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,18 Memorandum in Opposition Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss and in Response to Plaintiff's Opposition filed by Maxi-Aids, Inc., Elliot Zaretsky. (Frank, Keith) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Mon 12/18 2:13 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Barry Reiter. (Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Distributor Confidentiality and Unfair competition agreement), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Excerpts from Day 2 of Trial in Prior Action), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Excerpts from Day 3 of Trial in Prior Action) | ||
18 | 18
30+
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Mon 12/18 2:09 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Barry Reiter. (Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss
Mon 12/18 1:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Maxi-Aids, Inc., Elliot Zaretsky. (Frank, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A -Complaint - Case No. 17-cv-2417, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Complaint - Case No. 14-cv-3712, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Answer with Counterclaim - Case No. 14-cv-3712, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Answer to Amended Complaint with Counterclaim - Case No. 14-cv-3712, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Defendants' Amended Counterclaims - Case No. 14-cv-3712, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Defendants' Amended Correspondence to Court - Case No. 14-cv-3712, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G and H - Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims - Case No. 14-cv-3712, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit I - Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaims - Case No. 14-cv-3712, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit J - July 18, 2016 Trial Transcript - pages 18-27 - Case No. 14 cv-3712, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit K - July 20, 2016 Trial transcript pages 298-299 and 301-302 - Case No. 14-cv-3712, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit L - Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum - Case No. 14-cv-3712, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit M - Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Law - Case No. 14-cv-3712, | ||
Att: 13 Memorandum in Support Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, | ||
Att: 14 Declaration Declaration of Keith J. Frank in Support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 15 Affidavit of Service | ||
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 12/07 11:26 AM
DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadlines have been set. Status Conference set for 7/11/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. See order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/7/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 12/07 2:04 PM
Electronic ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 12/7/2017. (Disbrow, Sandra) |
||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 12/06 11:17 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 Letter /making application to serve the Reply papers on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and to submit the fully briefed Motion to the Court from December 11, 2017 to December 18, 2017 by Maxi-Aids, Inc., Elliot Zaretsky. (Frank, Keith) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 10/18 3:52 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/29/2017 02:15 PM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. See order for instructions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/18/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 GRB Individual Rules | ||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Wed 10/04 1:32 PM
Letter /to The Honorable Leonard D. Wexler - Pursuant to the August 25, 2017 Order the following document(s) have been served upon the Plaintiff's: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint with Supporting Exhibits by Maxi-Aids, Inc., Elliot Zaretsky (Frank, Keith) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Fri 08/25 9:52 AM
ORDER re12 Letter filed by Maxi-Aids, Inc., Elliot Zaretsky. The proposed briefing schedule for defendants' motion to dismiss is approved. Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 8/25/2017. (Ausili, Peter) |
||
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Thu 08/24 3:56 PM
Letter /proposed briefing schedule by Maxi-Aids, Inc., Elliot Zaretsky (Frank, Keith) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
order
Pretrial Order
Fri 08/11 3:53 PM
Electronic ORDER: The premotion conference requirement is waived. The parties shall confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule for the court's approval by 8/28/17. Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 8/11/2017. (Disbrow, Sandra) |
||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Fri 06/30 3:35 PM
Letter in Opposition to Defendants' June 23, 2017 Pre-Motion Conference Letter by Barry Reiter (Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/27 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Frank on behalf of Maxi-Aids, Inc., Elliot Zaretsky (aty to be noticed) (Frank, Keith) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Fri 06/23 10:44 AM
Letter /Request for Pre-Motion Conference to make Motion to Dismiss by Maxi-Aids, Inc., Elliot Zaretsky (Frank, Keith) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 05/02 2:43 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Leonard D. Wexler and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein, Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 5/2/2017. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 05/01 2:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Barry Reiter. Maxi-Aids, Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2017, answer due 6/23/2017; Elliot Zaretsky waiver sent on 4/24/2017, answer due 6/23/2017. (Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/25 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth D. Sommer on behalf of Barry Reiter (notification declined or already on case) (Sommer, Kenneth) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/25 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tanvir Haque Rahman on behalf of Barry Reiter (notification declined or already on case) (Rahman, Tanvir) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 11:54 AM
Summons Issued as to Elliot Zaretsky. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 11:53 AM
Summons Issued as to Maxi-Aids, Inc.. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/24 11:46 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/24 11:43 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/24 11:45 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (McMahon, Carol) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/21 8:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Maxi-Aids, Inc., Elliot Zaretsky filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9469605 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Barry Reiter. (Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Defendant Maxi-Aids, Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Defendant Elliot Zaretsky |