Norfolk Southern Railway Company v. Ashmore Bros Inc et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy M Cain |
Case #: | 7:17-cv-01030 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 15, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:10 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Rogers Group Inc
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Norfolk Southern Railway Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rogers Group Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norfolk Southern Railway Company
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Counter Claimant
Ashmore Bros Inc
Terminated: 06/19/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ashmore Bros Inc
Terminated: 06/19/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 03/15 9:29 AM
Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Ashmore Bros Inc, Rogers Group Inc. (Tonnsen, Eric) Modified on 3/15/2018: to remove terminated party, to add joint filer as listed on document (kmca) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 06/22 12:33 PM
CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/27/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/29/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/26/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/26/2018, Discovery due by 7/27/2018, Mediation Due by 8/6/2018, Motions due by 8/10/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/2/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 11/2/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/22/17. (kmca) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
adr
ADR Statement/Certification
Wed 06/21 4:18 PM
ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION for ADR by Norfolk Southern Railway Company(Smith, William) |
|
20 | 20
adr
ADR Statement/Certification
Wed 06/21 4:03 PM
ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Rogers Group Inc(Tonnsen, Eric) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 06/19 5:22 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Ashmore Bros Inc, Rogers Group Inc. (Tonnsen, Eric) |
|
16 | 16
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Mon 06/19 5:17 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Ashmore Bros Inc, Rogers Group Inc.(Tonnsen, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended conference and scheduling order | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Thu 05/25 9:25 AM
ANSWER to Counterclaim9 by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Smith, William) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Mediation Order
Tue 05/16 3:35 PM
MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 11/6/2017. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 5/16/17. (alew, ) |
|
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 05/16 2:04 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/5/2017, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/19/2017, Rule 26 Report due by 6/19/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/31/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/30/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/29/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/29/2017, Discovery due by 10/30/2017, Motions due by 11/13/2017, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/5/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 2/5/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 5/16/17. (alew, ) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Mon 05/15 9:08 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ashmore Bros Inc, Rogers Group Inc.(Tonnsen, Eric) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 05/15 9:06 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Rogers Group Inc, Ashmore Bros Inc.(Tonnsen, Eric) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/15 8:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Richard Tonnsen on behalf of Ashmore Bros Inc, Rogers Group Inc (Tonnsen, Eric) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Fri 04/28 12:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Ashmore Bros Inc served on 4/27/2017, answer due 5/18/2017.(Smith, William) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Wed 04/26 4:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Rogers Group Inc served on 4/24/2017, answer due 5/15/2017.(Smith, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Receipt | ||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/21 2:45 PM
Summons Issued as to Ashmore Bros Inc, Rogers Group Inc. (kmca) |
|
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 04/21 2:41 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(kmca) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/21 2:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Ashmore Bros Inc, Rogers Group Inc (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7115173), filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Service due by 7/20/2017.(kmca) |