Engel v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela Pepper |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00572 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
order
Judgment
Thu 08/22 5:13 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/22/2019. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Michelle Engel)(cb) |
|
28 | 28
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Hearings
Thu 08/22 5:11 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/22/2019.25 Plaintiff's motion to dismiss GRANTED; case DISMISSED without prejudice. Hearing set for 9/17/2019 CANCELLED. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Michelle Engel)(cb) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/21 11:48 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Adili, Javitt) |
|
26 | 26
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 08/21 11:47 AM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration re25 MOTION to Dismiss . (Adili, Javitt) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Dismiss
Fri 08/16 10:00 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Michelle A Engel. (jcl) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/07 9:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Marie Godfrey on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Attorney(s) appearing: Jean Godfrey(Godfrey, Jean) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 07/10 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Social Security Hearing set for 9/17/2019 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Judge Pamela Pepper. Parties wishing to appear by phone may do so by calling the court's conference line at 888-557-8511 and using access code 4893665#. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Michelle Engel)(cb) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 01/22 10:45 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Adili, Javitt) |
|
21 | 21
socsec
Commissioners Brief - Social Security
Mon 01/22 10:44 AM
Commissioners Brief filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Adili, Javitt) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 01/04 12:43 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/4/2018 re19 defendant's motion for extension of time to file defendant's brief. The court GRANTS, nunc pro tunc to December 21, 2017, the defendant's motion for extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendant to file her brief is EXTENDED until the end of the day on January 22, 2018; and the time for the plaintiff to file her reply, if she chooses to file one, is EXTENDED until the end of the day on February 6, 2018. The court further ORDERS that no further extensions will be granted to the defendant absent a showing of good cause. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Michelle Engel) (cb) |
||
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Declaration
Wed 12/20 5:43 PM
DECLARATION of Javitt Adili In Support of Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time (Adili, Javitt) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 12/20 5:41 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time To File Response Brief by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Adili, Javitt) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Tue 12/05 12:23 PM
LETTER from Plaintiff regarding the late filing of her brief. (blr) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Modify
Tue 11/21 4:50 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/21/2017 re17 defendant's motion to alter the briefing schedule. The court GRANTS the defendant's motion to alter the briefing schedule, dkt. no. 17. The court ORDERS that the time for defendant Berryhill to file her brief is EXTENDED until the end of the day on December 21, 2017. The court further ORDERS that the time for plaintiff Engel to file her reply, if she chooses to do so, is EXTENDED until the end of the day on January 4, 2018. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Michelle Engel) (cb) |
||
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Modify
Mon 11/20 12:21 PM
MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Adili, Javitt) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/20 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Javitt Adili on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Attorney(s) appearing: Javitt Adili (Adili, Javitt) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
socsec
Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security
Thu 11/09 3:16 PM
Plaintiff's Brief by Michelle A Engel. (blr) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 11/02 11:17 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/2/2017. By 11/24/2017, plaintiff to either file brief or show cause, in writing, why the court should not dismiss her case for lack of diligence under Civil LR 41(c). Failure to comply will result in dismissal of case for lack of diligence and failure to prosecute. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Michelle Engel-with copy of Rule 41(c))(cb) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
socsec
Certificate of Service - Social Security Transcript
Tue 08/08 2:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Pawlak, Brian) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
socsec
Return of Service
Thu 07/06 2:45 PM
Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 7/3/2017. (blr) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
socsec
Return of Service
Thu 07/06 1:38 PM
Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 6/28/2017. (blr) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
socsec
Briefing Letter
Thu 06/29 11:41 AM
Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 8/28/2017 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 10/9/2017; Defendant's response due 11/20/2017; Plaintiff's reply due 12/5/2017. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Michelle Engel) (cb) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
socsec
Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript
Mon 06/26 9:56 AM
Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript and Preservation of Rights filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Pawlak, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Transcript, | ||
Att: 2 Transcript, | ||
Att: 3 Transcript, | ||
Att: 4 Transcript, | ||
Att: 5 Transcript, | ||
Att: 6 Transcript, | ||
Att: 7 Transcript, | ||
Att: 8 Transcript, | ||
Att: 9 Transcript, | ||
Att: 10 Transcript, | ||
Att: 11 Transcript, | ||
Att: 12 Transcript, | ||
Att: 13 Certificate of Service | ||
8 | 8
socsec
Certificate of Service - Social Security Transcript
Mon 06/26 9:49 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Pawlak, Brian) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/26 9:48 AM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Pawlak, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
socsec
Transmittal of Complaint and Order
Mon 06/26 11:10 AM
Transmit1 Complaint and6 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Fri 06/23 4:24 PM
ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/23/2017 GRANTING2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Michelle Engel) (cb) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order of Recusal
Tue 04/25 11:59 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL Chief Judge William C Griesbach recused. Case reassigned to Judge Pamela Pepper for all further proceedings, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 4/25/2017. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Plaintiff)(Griesbach, William) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Supplement
Mon 04/24 3:49 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENTS by Michelle A Engel to1 Complaint - Social Security: Notice of Decision and Notice of Appeals Council Action (mac) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Refusal to Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/24 3:43 PM
REFUSAL to Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Michelle A Engel. (mac) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Fri 04/21 3:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Michelle A Engel. (mac) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security
Fri 04/21 3:29 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Michelle A Engel. Consent forms distributed to the parties for Magistrate Judge David E Jones (mac) |