Liddell v. Racine County Clerk of Courts et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J P Stadtmueller |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00565 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 20, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment
Fri 10/20 11:05 AM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved as to form by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/20/2017. Action DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1915A(b)(1) for failure to state a claim. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Anthony Liddell, Jr. at Dodge Correctional Institution)(jm) |
|
17 | 17
9
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 10/20 10:59 AM
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/20/2017: GRANTING2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee; DENYING as moot8 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee; DENYING6 and10 Plaintiff's Motions to Appoint Counsel; DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1915A(b)(1) for failure to state a claim; DIRECTING Clerk of Court to document that this inmate has incurred a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); ORDERING agency having custody of Plaintiff to collect the balance of the filing fee from Plaintiff's institution trust account in accordance with this Order; and CERTIFYING that any appeal from this matter would not be taken in good faith pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) unless Plaintiff offers bona fide arguments supporting his appeal. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Anthony Liddell, Jr. and Warden at Dodge Correctional Institution) (jm) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter (From Court)
Wed 09/20 12:55 PM
LETTER from the Clerk to Anthony Liddell, Jr regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel)(tlf) |
|
Att: 1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet | ||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 09/18 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address and Offender Request as to Anthony Liddell, Jr(lh) |
|
Att: 1 Offender Request | ||
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Request
Fri 08/18 9:30 AM
REQUEST by Anthony Liddell, Jr for conference call with appointed counsel and notification of change of address. (lh) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 08/01 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address as to Anthony Liddell, Jr. New address is Dodge Correctional Institution. (asc) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 06/30 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address as to Anthony Liddell, Jr. Current address is Racine County Jail. (asc) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Supplement
Tue 06/27 9:59 AM
SUPPLEMENT by Anthony Liddell, Jr re1 Complaint - Prisoner. (blr) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 06/27 9:58 AM
Second MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Anthony Liddell, Jr. (blr) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Supplement
Tue 06/13 11:51 AM
SUPPLEMENT by Anthony Liddell, Jr re1 Complaint - Prisoner. (asc) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 06/08 11:34 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee, NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony Liddell, Jr. (docket to Plaintiff's new address via US mail) (blr) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
misc
Initial Partial Filing Fee Received
Mon 06/05 3:25 PM
INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $15.77, receipt number MK4689-065986. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl) |
||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Tue 05/16 12:20 PM
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 5/16/2017 ORDERING that on or before 6/6/2017, plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $15.77 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Anthony Liddell, Jr. and Sheriff at Racine County Jail)(jm) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 05/12 12:15 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Anthony Liddell, Jr. (asc) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Mon 05/01 2:34 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Anthony Liddell, Jr. (asc) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 05/01 2:30 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Anthony Liddell, Jr. (asc) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate
Fri 04/21 3:48 PM
LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days (asc) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Fri 04/21 3:37 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Anthony Liddell, Jr. (asc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Prisoner
Fri 04/21 3:36 PM
PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against All Defendants by Anthony Liddell, Jr. (asc) |