Kohler Co v. Amerisink Inc
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela Pepper |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00573 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
Amerisink Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kohler Co
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
misc
Transfer File-Out of District
Thu 06/22 2:02 PM
Case electronically sent to transfer court on 6/22/2017 (vkb) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Transfer Case
Tue 06/20 3:09 PM
ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/20/2017 APPROVING9 Stipulation to Transfer Action to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. (cc: all counsel) (cb) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Transfer Case
Thu 06/15 5:12 PM
Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California by Amerisink Inc.(Swanson, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 05/19 3:31 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by Kohler Co re7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . (Jelenchick, Kadie) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 05/19 3:59 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/19/2017 GRANTING7 Defendant's motion for an extension of time to 6/15/2017 to file a response to plaintiff's complaint. The court ORDERS that the deadline for the defendant to file a response to the plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED to the end of the day on 6/15/2017. (cc: all counsel) (pwm) |
||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 05/16 5:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Amerisink Inc.(Swanson, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 05/12 9:52 AM
Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kohler Co. (Peters, Matthew) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 05/12 11:34 AM
Due to non-consent of the parties case reassigned to Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc) |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/02 10:21 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kohler Co. Amerisink Inc served on 4/25/2017. (Peters, Matthew) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
Mon 04/24 8:47 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (asc) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 8:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Amerisink Inc. (asc) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/21 5:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W Peters on behalf of Kohler Co. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey N. Costakos; Matthew W. Peters (Peters, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/21 5:13 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Kohler Co. (Jelenchick, Kadie) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/21 4:12 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Amerisink Inc by Kohler Co. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2564043)(Jelenchick, Kadie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 11 Summons Summons | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 04/21 4:20 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available on our website; pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (lls) |