Gonzales v. MCFI Home Care LLC
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela Pepper |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00574 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 29:2601 Family & Medical Leave Act 1993 |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 4:37 AM CDT |
Defendant
MCFI Home Care LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherri Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 01/02 11:20 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation and Order for Dismissal by MCFI Home Care LLC. (Gumina, Frank) |
|
17 | 17
order
Text Only Order
Tue 01/02 10:49 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 01/02/2018: Judge Duffin has reported that the parties have mediated, and settled, the case. The court ORDERS that if the parties have not filed the appropriate settlement documents by the end of the day on February 2, 2018 , the court will calendar a status conference. NOTE: There is no document associated with this text-only order. (cc: all counsel)(Pepper, Pamela) |
|
16 | 16
minutes
Settlement Conference ~Util - Case No Longer Referred
Tue 01/02 8:13 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin: Settlement Conference held on 12/28/2017. Parties settled the matter. Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. (No document is attached to this entry.) (djo) |
|
utility
Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys
Mon 01/08 2:38 PM
Case Terminated (vkb) |
||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 11/29 3:08 PM
ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 11/29/2017. Settlement Conference set for 12/28/2017 at 09:00 AM (all day set aside) in Courtroom 242, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Deadline for documents to Court is 12/27/2017 by 12:00 PM. See Order for additional deadlines and instructions. (cc: all counsel)(lz) |
|
14 | 14
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 11/29 1:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/29/2017. Mediation set for 12/28/2017 at 9:00 am. Other deadlines set. Order to issue setting forth deadlines and mediation procedures. (Tape #9:31:43 - 9:45:11 a.m.) (lz) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 11/21 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference to set a mediation date set for 11/29/2017 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Participants shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and use access code 8322317# to join the call. (cc: all counsel)(lz) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (for mediation)
Tue 11/21 10:20 AM
ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/21/2017 APPROVING11 stipulation regarding voluntary mediation and REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for mediation. (cc: all counsel)(cb) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Fri 11/17 4:09 PM
STIPULATION Regarding Voluntary Mediation by MCFI Home Care LLC.(Hutchens, Tiffany) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 08/24 3:49 PM
Minute and Order entry for proceedings held before Judge Pamela Pepper: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 8/24/2017. Parties to exchange initial discovery disclosures by 8/15/2017; amended pleadings due 9/25/2017; plaintiff's expert witness list due 12/15/2017; defendant's expert witness list due 1/15/2018; discovery due 3/9/2018; dispositive motions due 4/13/2018. Any party filing proposed findings of fact shall also e-mail a Word version of those proposed findings to PepperPO@wied.uscourts.gov. (cb) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Plan
Tue 08/08 3:18 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Sherri Gonzales. (Halstead, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 06/28 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2017 at 11:30 AM by telephone before Judge Pamela Pepper. Parties may appear by calling the court's conference line at 888-557-8511 and using access code 4893665#. On or before 8/17/2017, parties to file joint Rule 26(f) plan. (cc: all counsel)(cb) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 06/28 11:53 AM
Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 8/17/2017 (cb) |
||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/30 3:49 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Gumina, Frank) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/30 3:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants.(Gumina, Frank) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/30 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Frank A Gumina on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Frank Gumina and Tiffany Hutchens (Gumina, Frank) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/18 4:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherri Gonzales. MCFI Home Care LLC served on 5/8/2017. (Halstead, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/26 3:20 PM
Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Sherri Gonzales. (Halstead, Aaron) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 2:13 PM
Summons Issued as to MCFI Home Care LLC. (vkb) |
||
misc
Case Opening Modification
Mon 04/24 2:18 PM
Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: Addresses for the parties have been removed - please remember to follow the case opening guidelines found on our website.(vkb) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/21 4:10 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Sherri Gonzales. (Halstead, Aaron) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/21 4:01 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against MCFI Home Care LLC by Sherri Gonzales. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2564029)(Halstead, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Summons MCFI Home Care LLC, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 04/21 4:08 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available on our website; pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (lls) |