Biedermann et al v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J P Stadtmueller |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00576 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 4:36 AM CDT |
Defendant
John and/or Jane Doe
|
|
Defendant
Claims Management Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cody Mans
|
|
Defendant
Bruce Wenzel
|
|
Involuntary Plaintiff
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
|
|
Involuntary Plaintiff
Network Health Plan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale C Biedermann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynette M Biedermann
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago |
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
misc
Transmit Complaint/Notice/Waiver
Thu 07/27 12:29 PM
Mailed via USPS Certified Copy of Docket and Order to Outagamie County Circuit Court. (asc) |
||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Remanding Case
Wed 07/26 3:47 PM
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 7/26/2017 REMANDING CASE to Outagamie County Circuit Court. Clerk of Court DIRECTED to take all appropriate steps to effectuate the remand. (cc: all counsel)(jm) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/25 11:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Cody Mans, Bruce Wenzel. (asc) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 07/24 3:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lynette M Biedermann, Dale C Biedermann.(Sewall, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Summons - Cody Mans, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Summons - Bruce Wenzel | ||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Fri 07/21 9:59 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 7/21/2017. (Court Reporter Heidi Trapp) (cb) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Plan
Wed 07/19 9:29 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Sewall, Mark) |
|
misc
Notice of Electronic Filing Error
Wed 07/19 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re8 Report of Rule 26(f) Plan filed by Dale C Biedermann, Lynette M Biedermann ; Electronically filed documents should not be scanned whenever possible. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc) |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Plan
Tue 07/18 5:50 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Phillips, Nelson) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 07/06 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 7/18/2017. (cc: all counsel)(jm) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Mon 05/15 4:14 PM
LETTER to Atty Sewall re: Admission and ECF registration (jcl) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 05/15 8:58 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case due to non-consent. (lz) |
||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 05/12 4:21 PM
Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Phillips, Nelson) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate
Tue 05/09 10:32 AM
NOTICE from the clerk to Defendants Wal-Mart Stores and Claims Management Inc requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (lz) |
||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/08 6:54 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Phillips, Nelson) |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/08 6:52 PM
Wal-Mart Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores Inc and Claims Management Inc.(Phillips, Nelson) Modified on 5/9/2017 to reflect all filers (lz) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 04/24 8:57 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl) |
||
notice
Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate
Mon 04/24 11:04 AM
NOTICE from the Clerk to Involuntary Plaintiff Network Health Plan requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (lz) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/21 5:43 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. from Outagamie Court, Case Number: 17cv255 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2564200)(Phillips, Nelson) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 |