FlyGLO, LLC
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Meredith S Grabill |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-11015 |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 07, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
FlyGLO, LLC
940 Gravier St
New Orleans, LA 70112-1602 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
400 Poydras Street Suite 2110
New Orleans, LA 70130 |
1. | New Orleans startup airline GLO files for bankruptcy protection (nola.com) |
Submitted Tue 04/25/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2017 7:00 PM CDT |
Sunday, April 23, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Sun 04/23 7:36 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11015 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 5846757, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
6
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 04/23 7:33 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by FlyGLO, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/21/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 08/21/2017. Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing due by 05/1/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 05/8/2017. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/21/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 08/21/2017. (Draper, Douglas) |
|
2 | 2
3
pgs
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Sun 04/23 7:39 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non- Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders w/Declaration Filed by FlyGLO, LLC (Draper, Douglas) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
misc
Equity Security Holders
Sun 04/23 7:40 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by FlyGLO, LLC (Draper, Douglas) |
|
4 | 4
6
pgs
misc
Creditor List
Sun 04/23 7:42 PM
List of Creditors Filed by FlyGLO, LLC (Draper, Douglas) |