Mazzone v. 25 Broadway Brooklyn Inc et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond J Dearie |
Referred: | Steven Tiscione |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02420 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 20, 2017 5:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
25 Broadway Brooklyn Inc
|
|
Defendant
Joseph A. Lentini
|
|
Plaintiff
Edith C. Mazzone
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 08/16 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(l)(A)(ii). SO Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 8/16/2017. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/14 10:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Edith C. Mazzone with prejudice (Demetriades, Tara) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 08/08 10:24 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that Defendants 25 Broadway Brooklyn Inc, Joseph A. Lentini have failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of Defendants 25 Broadway Brooklyn Inc, Joseph A. Lentini is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Hamilton, Janet) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Order(Other)
Tue 08/08 11:55 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The August 10th conference is adjourned without date. Counsel for Plaintiff shall file a motion for default by September 8th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 8/8/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Mon 08/07 8:32 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Edith C. Mazzone (Demetriades, Tara) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Status Report
Mon 08/07 8:18 PM
STATUS REPORT by Edith C. Mazzone (Demetriades, Tara) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 08/07 8:17 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference on August 10, 2017, at 10:30 am by Edith C. Mazzone. (Demetriades, Tara) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/04 6:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edith C. Mazzone. 25 Broadway Brooklyn Inc served on 4/28/2017, answer due 5/19/2017. (Demetriades, Tara) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/04 6:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edith C. Mazzone. Joseph A. Lentini served on 4/28/2017, answer due 5/19/2017. (Demetriades, Tara) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/05 1:42 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person settlement conference will be held at 10:30 a.m. on August 10, 2017 before the undersigned in Hearing Room N324 in the North Wing. The individual Plaintiff client and a principal with full settlement authority for Defendant must personally appear with counsel at the conference. Counsel are directed to submit their respective settlement position letters via ex parte electronic filing no later than August 8th. A discovery schedule will be set by the Court if the case fails to settle during the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/5/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 1:51 PM
Summons Issued as to 25 Broadway Brooklyn Inc, Joseph A. Lentini. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/24 1:49 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/24 1:48 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Sunday, April 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 04/23 11:54 AM
COMPLAINT against 25 Broadway Brooklyn Inc, Joseph A. Lentini filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9469731 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Edith C. Mazzone. (Demetriades, Tara) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/24 1:48 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |