Hayes v. The City of New York et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sterling Johnson, Jr |
Referred: | Robert M Levy |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02422 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 20, 2017 5:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Police Officer Jason Maccaron
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Hayes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 08/07 11:20 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. ( Ordered by Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr on 8/2/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/01 11:10 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal and Proposed Order by Jason Maccaron, The City of New York (Aribakan, Suzanne) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 07/17 12:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Jonathan Wachlarz, Suzanne Aribakan. The parties have agreed to a settlement. A stipulation of discontinuance shall be filed by 8/31/18.Settlement Conference held on 7/17/2018 (Levy, Robert) |
||
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 07/10 3:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Jonathan Wachlarz, Suzanne Aribakan. Discovery complete. City will advise at next conference whether a settlement conference would be fruitful. Next conference 7/17/18 at 12:00 (tel)(settlement status). Pretrial order schedule: plaintiff's draft 9/14/18; defendants' draft 9/28/18; filing of Joint Pretrial order 10/5/18.Status Conference held on 7/10/2018 (Levy, Robert) |
||
order
Order Certifying Discovery
Tue 07/10 3:37 PM
Order Certifying Discovery is complete.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/10/2018. (Levy, Robert) |
||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice(Other)
Mon 06/25 1:01 PM
NOTICE by James Hayes Withdrawal of Attorney (Massimi, Jessica) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/19 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Wachlarz on behalf of James Hayes (aty to be noticed) (Wachlarz, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 05/09 2:20 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Jessica Massimi, Suzanne Aribakan. Discovery deadline extended to 6/29/18. Defendants will advise plaintiff's counsel when Officer Maccaron, who is out on line of duty injury, will be available to testify and whether he needs accommodations. Settlement explored but premature. Next conference 7/10/18 at 10:30 (tel)(close of discovery).Status Conference held on 5/9/2018 (Levy, Robert) |
||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Mon 05/07 5:44 PM
Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute by James Hayes (Massimi, Jessica) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 04/30 5:50 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to 5/9/18 to Complete afford counsel the opportunity to meet and confer to resolve one discovery dispute. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 4/30/2018. (Levy, Robert) |
||
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 04/26 4:46 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by James Hayes. (Massimi, Jessica) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 03/27 5:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Partial Dismissal Regarding Only Plaintiff's Monell Claim by James Hayes (Massimi, Jessica) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 03/02 2:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Jessica Massimi, Suzanne Aribakan. The discovery deadline is extended approximately 60 days to 5/4/18. All discovery shall be completed by then. Next conference 5/9/18 at 2:00 (tel)(close of discovery).Status Conference held on 3/2/2018 (Levy, Robert) |
||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 01/18 10:45 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/18/2018. (Marino, Janine) |
||
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Protective Order
Wed 01/17 2:27 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Jason Maccaron, The City of New York. (Aribakan, Suzanne) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Tue 10/03 10:35 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Jessica Massimi, Suzanne Aribakan. Discovery deadline 3/2/18. Next conference 3/2/18 at 2:00 (tel)(close of discovery).Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/3/2017 (Levy, Robert) |
||
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 10/02 10:49 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Jason Maccaron, The City of New York. (Aribakan, Suzanne) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 08/11 12:09 PM
ORDER RE8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/11/2017. (Marino, Janine) |
||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 08/01 11:27 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The City of New York. (Aribakan, Suzanne) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/25 12:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/3/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/25/2017. (Marino, Janine) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/14 1:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Hayes. The City of New York served on 7/13/2017, answer due 8/3/2017. (Massimi, Jessica) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/14 1:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Hayes. Jason Maccaron served on 7/13/2017, answer due 8/3/2017. (Massimi, Jessica) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 2:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Jason Maccaron, The City of New York. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/24 2:03 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/24 2:02 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/24 2:01 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Sunday, April 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 04/23 3:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Jason Maccaron, The City of New York filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9469742 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by James Hayes. (Massimi, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Maccaron Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons City Proposed Summons |