Williams v. Receivables Performance Management, LLC
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Margo K Brodie |
Referred: | Vera M Scanlon |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02423 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 20, 2017 5:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
Receivables Performance Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bria Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 09/01 2:07 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE . IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s), that the above-entitled action against Defendant shall be and hereby is dismissed with prejudice and without costs, or disbursements, or attorneys' fees to any party, pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 9/1/2017. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 08/29 4:56 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bria Williams (Mizrahi, Joseph) |
|
order
Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 08/29 9:00 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: The Parties failed to comply with the Court's 8/10/2017 Order. On or before 8/30/2017, the Parties must comply. The Parties are warned that failure to comply with the Court's Orders may result in sanctions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/29/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 08/10 10:15 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. STATUS REPORT ORDER: On or before 8/25/2017, the Parties will file their stipulation of dismissal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/10/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Wed 08/09 3:25 PM
STATUS REPORT Re: Stipulation of Discontinuance by Bria Williams (Mizrahi, Joseph) |
|
order
Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 08/09 12:08 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: The Parties failed to comply with the Court's 7/20/2017 Order. On or before 8/10/2017, the Parties must comply. The Parties are warned that failure to comply with the Court's Orders may result in sanctions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/9/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 07/20 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Bria Williams (Mizrahi, Joseph) |
|
order
Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 07/20 3:39 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: At13 , Plaintiff states that this matter has settled. On or before 8/4/2017, the Parties will file their stipulation of dismissal or a status report letter indicating three dates on which all Parties are available for an Initial Conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/20/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/18 6:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Receivables Performance Management, LLC (Cipparulo, Peter) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/17 6:04 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Receivables Performance Management, LLC. (Cipparulo, Peter) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 07/13 12:36 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Receivables Performance Management, LLC (Cipparulo, Peter) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 06/09 11:56 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Service of Court Order served on Peter Cipparulo on 06/09/2017, filed by Bria Williams. (Mizrahi, Joseph) |
|
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 06/09 11:24 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 7/20/2017 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 504 North. Plaintiff must appear in person for the conference. Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to serve this Order on Defendant's counsel, and to file an affidavit of service by 6/16/2017. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 7/13/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/9/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/09 11:20 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Peter Cipparulo, III is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By 6/14/2017, Mr. Cipparulo shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, Mr. Cipparulo shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, he shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/9/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/24 4:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9553044. by Receivables Performance Management, LLC. (Cipparulo, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/16 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Mizrahi on behalf of Bria Williams (aty to be noticed) (Mizrahi, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/09 2:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bria Williams. Receivables Performance Management, LLC served on 5/3/2017, answer due 5/24/2017. (Cohen, Daniel) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/24 3:32 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/24 3:32 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Sunday, April 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 3:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Receivables Performance Management, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 04/23 4:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Receivables Performance Management, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9469747 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Bria Williams. (Cohen, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/24 3:24 PM
Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |