Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-10772

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-50351
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Apr 21, 2017
Terminated:Sep 13, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
State Of Washington
1300 Quince Street SE
Olympia, WA 98504
Represented By
State Of Washington
contact info
Defendant
Washington State Board for Community & Technical Colleges
1300 Quince Street SE
Olympia, WA 98504
Represented By
Washington State Board for Community & Technical Colleges
contact info
Plaintiff
Ciber, Inc.
6312 South Fiddler's Green Circle Suite 600E
Greenwood Village, CO 80111
Represented By
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, September 13, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Thu 09/13 10:03 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-50351 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 12, 2018
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 09/12 3:12 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Ciber, Inc.. (Edelson, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2017
22 22 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Wed 07/12 6:21 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Christine Porter Regarding July 13 Hearing Agenda . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 18
21 21 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Wed 07/12 3:11 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by CIBER, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/13/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Edelson, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
20 20 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Tue 07/11 9:35 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Christine Porter Regarding Order Granting Motion to Shorten Notice and Objection Periods in Connection with the Debtors' Motion for an Order Approving and Authorizing Entry into the Settlement and Release Agreement By and Among Ciber, Inc., the State of Washington, and the Washington State Board for Community and Technical Colleges and Notice of Hearing Scheduled for July 13, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (ET) . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 15 ,16
19 19 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Tue 07/11 3:53 PM
Order Approving and Authorizing Entry Into the Settlement and Release Agreement by and Among Ciber, Inc., The State of Washington, and The Washington State Board for Community & Technical Colleges Related [+]. Signed on 7/11/2017. (SJS)
Related: [-] 13
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
18 18 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 07/11 11:54 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by CIBER, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/13/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Edelson, Justin)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Certificate of No Objection(Aty) Tue 07/11 11:49 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Motion for an Order Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Section 105(a) and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Approving and Authorizing Entry Into the Settlement and Release Agreement By and Among Ciber, Inc., the State of Washington, and the Washington State Board for Community & Technical Colleges Related [+] Filed by Ciber, Inc.. (Edelson, Justin)
Related: [-] 13
Wednesday, July 05, 2017
16 16 notice Hearing - Notice Wed 07/05 2:12 PM
Notice of Hearing re: Debtors' Motion for an Order Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Section 105(a) and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Approving and Authorizing Entry Into the Settlement and Release Agreement By and Among Ciber, Inc., the State of Washington, and the Washington State Board for Community & Technical Colleges Related [+] Filed by Ciber, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/13/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/10/2017. (Edelson, Justin)
Related: [-] 13
15 15 order Shorten Time Wed 07/05 1:30 PM
Order Granting Motion to Shorten Notice and Objection Periods in Connection with the Debtors' Motion for an Order Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Section 105(a) and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Approving and Authorizing Entry Into the Settlement and Release Agreement By and Among Ciber, Inc., the State of Washington, and the Washington State Board for Community and Technical Colleges Related [+] Order Signed on 7/5/2017. (MAS)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
14 14 motion Shorten - Motion Wed 06/28 2:16 PM
Motion to Shorten Notice and Objection Periods in Connection with the Debtors' Motion for an Order Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Section 105(a) and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Approving and Authorizing Entry Into the Settlement and Release Agreement By and Among Ciber, Inc., the State of Washington, and the Washington State Board for Community & Technical Colleges Related [+] Filed by Ciber, Inc.. (Edelson, Justin)
Related: [-] 13
Att: 1 Exhibit A
13 13 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Wed 06/28 2:09 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 / Debtors' Motion for an Order Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Section 105(a) and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Approving and Authorizing Entry Into the Settlement and Release Agreement By and Among Ciber, Inc., the State of Washington, and the Washington State Board for Community & Technical Colleges Filed by CIBER, Inc.. (Edelson, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2017
12 12 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Mon 06/19 3:59 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+], Counterclaim by State Of Washington, Washington State Board for Community & Technical Colleges against Ciber, Inc. Filed by State Of Washington, Washington State Board for Community & Technical Colleges Mediation due date: 10/17/2017. (Stolier, David)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, June 16, 2017
11 11 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 06/16 3:32 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by State Of Washington, Washington State Board for Community & Technical Colleges (Stolier, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/08 1:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 06/07/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, June 05, 2017
9 9 10 pgs misc Transcript Mon 06/05 7:41 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 6/1/2017 Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/5/2017. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Elaine Ryan, Telephone number (302) 683-0221.] . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/12/2017. Redaction Request Due By 6/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/6/2017. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/5/2017. (AJL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2017
8 8 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Wed 05/31 7:04 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Paul Pullo regarding Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on June 1, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (ET) . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. Related [+] (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice Tue 05/30 11:57 AM
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing Filed by Ciber, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 6/1/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Edelson, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, May 25, 2017
6 6 motion Stipulation Thu 05/25 1:27 PM
Stipulation Between Ciber, Inc. and Defendants Setting Time to Answer Complaint . Filed by Ciber, Inc.. (Edelson, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2017
5 5 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Wed 04/26 6:15 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Christine Porter regarding Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. Related [+] (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 2
Tuesday, April 25, 2017
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 04/25 11:27 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants State Of Washington, Washington State Board for Community & Technical Colleges. (amended only to include the adversary number in the case caption) Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 6/26/2017. (Ward, Christopher)
Related: [-] ument1
Monday, April 24, 2017
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 04/24 3:45 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-50351 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8423096, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2017
2 2 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 04/21 4:59 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants State Of Washington, Washington State Board for Community & Technical Colleges. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 6/20/2017. (Ward, Christopher)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 04/21 4:55 PM
Adversary case 17-50351 Complaint by Ciber, Inc. against State Of Washington, Washington State Board for Community & Technical Colleges. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))). AP Summons Served due date: 07/20/2017. (Ward, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives