Peak Hotels and Resorts Group, Ltd
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | A Jay Cristol |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-15041 |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Aug 02, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Oct 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 16, 2017 |
Debtor
Peak Hotels and Resorts Group, Ltd
1500 Bay Rd Apt 1582S
Miami Beach, FL 33139-3282 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Petitioning Creditor
High-Def Zone, Inc.
215 McNair Circle
Northampton, PA 18067 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Jacqueline Calderin
936 SW 1 Ave # 880
Miami, FL 33130 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 08/11/2017 2:37 PM EDT |
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Mon 04/24 3:57 PM
Receipt of Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-15041 [misc,invol7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29699298. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
2
pgs
misc
Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Mon 04/24 3:56 PM
Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition Re: Peak Hotels and Resorts Group, Ltd Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s) High-Def Zone, Inc. (attorney Joel M. Aresty Esq.) (Aresty, Joel) |