Waters v. City of Baltimore et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | George Levi Russell, III |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01113 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 09/21 9:58 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to7 Notice of Appeal filed by Benjamin Henry Waters, III. (slss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
USCA Judgment
Thu 08/30 11:27 AM
JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy)"Dismissing" this appeal as to7 Notice of Appeal filed by Benjamin Henry Waters, III. (slss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 04/04 2:12 PM
USCA Case Number 18-1367 for7 Notice of Appeal filed by Benjamin Henry Waters, III - Case Manager - Anisha Walker. (slss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 04/03 2:57 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re7 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(slss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
appeal
Record to 4cca
Tue 04/03 3:01 PM
Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit -- Initial(slss, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 04/03 2:51 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Benjamin Henry Waters, III (slss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Correspondence
Wed 09/27 11:29 AM
Correspondence from Benjamin H. Waters, III(ko, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 09/12 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Benjamin Henry Waters, III(krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 08/01 12:48 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/31/2017. (c/m 8/1/2017)(ko, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Thu 06/08 3:41 PM
ORDER dismissing certain allegations in complaint without prejudice to permit Plaintiff to bring these claims as a separate action and to file an amended complaint in GLR 16-3238 directing Waters to file within 21 days a supplement to his complaint. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 6/8/2017. (c/m 6/8/2017)(ko, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/24 10:19 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin Henry Waters, III(ko, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 10:19 AM
COMPLAINT against Baltimore City Department of Corrections, Baltimore City Police Department, City of Baltimore, State Attorney Officer, filed by Benjamin Henry Waters, III.(ko, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |