Joyner v. Warden et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | James K Bredar |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01118 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2018 |
Petitioner
Anthony Joyner
|
|
Respondent
Maryland Attorney General
|
|
Respondent
Warden
|
GPO
Jan 25 2018
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/24/2018. (c/m 1/25/18 bas, Deputy Clerk) |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thu 01/25 11:59 AM
ORDER Denying29 Motion for Evidence Hearing; Denying30 Motion for Default Judgment; Denying31 Motion for Respondents to Comply with Courts Orders ; Denying and Dismissing1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; A Certificate of Appealability shall not Issue. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/24/2018. (c/m 1/25/18 bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
32 | 32
23
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Thu 01/25 11:51 AM
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/24/2018. (c/m 1/25/18 bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 12/06 1:22 PM
MOTION for Respondents to Comply with Courts Orders by Anthony Joyner(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
30 | 30
motion
Default - Judgment
Wed 12/06 1:19 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Anthony Joyner(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 12/06 1:19 PM
MOTION for Evidence Hearing by Anthony Joyner(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Supplemental
Wed 12/06 1:17 PM
Supplement to17 Reply re9 Response to Habeas Petition,,,,, filed by Anthony Joyner(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits | ||
27 | 27
corresp
Miscellaneous
Wed 12/06 1:14 PM
Correspondence received from Anthony Joyner. (bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
corresp
Miscellaneous
Wed 11/15 1:36 PM
Correspondence re:(Dietrich, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Transcript November 10, 2011, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Transcript July 28, 2016 | ||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 10/16 12:50 PM
ORDER Granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/13/2017. (c/m 10/16/17 bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 10/13 3:18 PM
Case reassigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. Judge J. Frederick Motz no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 10/06 9:11 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Maryland Attorney General.(Dietrich, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion for Discovery Order on Motion for Writ of Mandamus Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 10/04 7:59 AM
ORDER Granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply; Granting11 Motion for Respondents to Comply with Order to Provide 180 Day Postponement and Post-Conviction Transcripts with Petitioner Exhibits; Denying12 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Denying13 Motion for Discovery; Denying14 Motion for Investigation; Granting in Part and Denying in Part15 Motion to Expand Record; Denying18 Second Motion for Discovery; Denying20 Motion for Writ of Mandamus; Denying21 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/3/2017. (c/m 10/04/17 bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
corresp
Miscellaneous
Tue 08/22 1:09 PM
Correspondence received from Anthony Joyner re: Request for Copy Work. (bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Stay
Mon 08/07 3:50 PM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Anthony Joyner(krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Writ of Mandamus
Mon 08/07 3:50 PM
MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Anthony Joyner(krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Affidavit
Mon 08/07 3:49 PM
AFFIDAVIT by Anthony Joyner(krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Discovery
Mon 08/07 3:49 PM
Second MOTION for Discovery by Anthony Joyner(krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Response
Mon 08/07 3:48 PM
REPLY re9 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Anthony Joyner.(krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Discovery Order on Motion for Other Relief
Mon 07/17 2:52 PM
ORDER Denying without prejudice3 Motion for Discovery; Granting in Part and Denying in Part4 Motion for Appropriate Relief and Affidavit. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/17/2017. (c/m 7/17/17 bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/17 2:29 PM
MOTION to Expand Record by Anthony Joyner(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/17 2:28 PM
MOTION for Investigation by Department of Justice by Anthony Joyner(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Discovery
Mon 07/17 2:26 PM
MOTION for Discovery by Anthony Joyner(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 07/17 2:25 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Anthony Joyner(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/17 2:25 PM
MOTION for Respondents to Comply with Order to Provide 180 Day Postponement and Post-Conviction Transcripts with Petitioner Exhibits of Evidence by Anthony Joyner(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 07/17 2:22 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply by Anthony Joyner(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Wed 07/05 2:30 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Maryland Attorney General.(Dietrich, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Docket Entries, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Transcript November 3, 2011, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Transcript November 4, 2011, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Transcript February 13, 2012, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Transcript February 14, 2012, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Transcript May 1, 2012, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Transcript August 30, 2012, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Brief of Appellant CSA, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Brief of Appellee CSA, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Unreported Unreported Opinion & Mandate CSA, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Petition for Writ of Certiorari, Supplemental & Order, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Petition for Post Conviction Relief, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Amended Petition for Post Conviction Relief, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Second Amended Petition for Post Conviction Relief, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Third Amended Petition for Post Conviction Relief, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Fourth Amended Petition for Post Conviction Relief, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Supplemental Petition for Post Conviction Relief, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Second Supplemental Petition for Post Conviction Relief, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit Statement and Order of Court denying, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit Belated Application for Leave to Appeal the Denial of Post-Conviction, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit Order of the CSA dismissing ALA | ||
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 06/05 1:13 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to and including July 5, 2017. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/5/2017. (c/m 6/5/17) (kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 06/02 1:41 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Maryland Attorney General.(Kelley, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Supplemental
Mon 05/15 12:47 PM
Supplement to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Maryland Attorney General(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/26 2:22 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing Respondents to file an Answer to the Petition on or before 40 days. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/26/2017. (c/m/em 4/26/17) (krs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Other Relief
Mon 04/24 3:37 PM
MOTION for Appropriate Relief and Affidavit by Anthony Joyner(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Discovery
Mon 04/24 3:35 PM
MOTION for Discovery by Anthony Joyner(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/24 3:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Joyner(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 04/24 3:30 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Anthony Joyner.(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Grounds Continued, | ||
Att: 2 Attachments | ||
misc
Filing Fee Paid
Mon 04/24 3:34 PM
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 14637097397 (bas, Deputy Clerk) |