Hargett v. Johns Hopkins Hospital et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | J Frederick Motz |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01119 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 11/13 10:52 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to6 Notice of Appeal filed by Kim L. Hargett, Sr. (slss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
appeal
USCA Judgment
Fri 10/20 10:50 AM
JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) "Affirming" the judgment of the District Court as to6 Notice of Appeal filed by Kim L. Hargett, Sr. (slss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 07/06 11:47 AM
USCA Case Number 17-6847 for6 Notice of Appeal filed by Kim L. Hargett, Sr.. Case Manager - Ashley B. Webb (kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
7 | 7
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Thu 07/06 9:27 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re6 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
appeal
Record to 4cca
Thu 07/06 9:37 AM
Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit -- Initial(kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 07/06 9:22 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to5 Order Dismissing Case by Kim L. Hargett, Sr. (kr2, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 05/31 11:35 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/31/2017. (c/m 5/31/17 bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
corresp
Miscellaneous
Thu 05/25 12:50 PM
Correspondence received from Kim L. Hargett, Sr. re: Case Status. (bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
corresp
Miscellaneous
Wed 05/24 1:06 PM
Correspondence received from Kim L. Hargett, Sr. re: Support of Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order
Wed 05/10 3:17 PM
Granting plainitff 21 days to either pay the Civil Filing fee or file a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/10/2017. (c/m 5/10/17 bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 3:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Norman J. Beauchamp, Raymond Neil Borland, Arjon S. Chanumugain, Johns Hopkins Hospital, Bronwnyn Jones, Thomas J. Polasck, Valerir Pomper, filed by Kim L. Hargett, Sr.(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 |