Hays v. Berryhill
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Stephanie A Gallagher |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01121 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 15, 2018 |
Defendant
Nancy A. Berryhill
|
|
Interested Party
SSA Notify
|
|
Plaintiff
Timothy W Hays
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
4
pgs
order
Memorandum and Order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Fri 02/16 7:41 AM
ORDER denying18 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting19 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 2/15/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 12/18 4:32 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Sahai, Kavita) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 10/30 3:10 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Timothy W Hays.(Shea, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum | ||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/06 10:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen F Shea on behalf of Timothy W Hays (Shea, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/30 11:48 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 8/30/2017. (c/m 8/30/17 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/30/2017 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Thu 06/29 3:32 PM
ORDER staying the case for up to 60 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 6/29/2017. (c/m by ch)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Local Rule
Thu 06/29 2:00 PM
Local Rule 101.2 letter mailed to Plaintiff.(c/m 6/29/17 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/29 1:53 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Alan J Nuta terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 6/29/2017. (c/m 6/29/17 bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Wed 06/28 4:18 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re10 Proposed Social Security Scheduling Order filed by Nancy A. Berryhill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 6/28/2017. (vals, Chambers) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 06/28 12:08 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Timothy W Hays(Nuta, Alan) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Social Security Scheduling Order
Wed 06/28 6:22 AM
Proposed Social Security Scheduling Order submitted by Nancy A. Berryhill(Sahai, Kavita) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Transcript
Wed 06/28 6:21 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Sahai, Kavita) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/08 8:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kavita Sahai on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Sahai, Kavita) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 05/11 2:40 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/11/2017 (cags, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/10 9:24 AM
PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 04/25 2:09 PM
Summons Issued 60 days as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/25 2:08 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and directing Counsel to effectuate service of the summons and complaint on Defendant. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/25/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
corresp
Magistrate Judge - consent to
Mon 04/24 3:11 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Nuta, Alan) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/24 3:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy W Hays(Nuta, Alan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 3:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Timothy W Hays.(Nuta, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons |